EP0994399 - Monitoring system with power supply built therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TLV Co., Ltd. 881 Nagasuna, Noguchi-cho Kakogawa-shi Hyogo 675-8511 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states T L V Co., Ltd. 881 Nagasuna Noguchi-cho Kakogawa-shi Hyogo 675 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagase, Mamoru 684-2 Miyamae Nishikanki-cho Kakogawa Hyogo 675 / JP | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2001/14] | van Loon, C.J.J., et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2000/16] | Gleiss, Alf-Olav, Dr.jur. Dipl.-Ing., et al Gleiss & Grosse Patentanwaltskanzlei Maybachstrasse 6A 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99117287.5 | 02.09.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | JP19980293634 | 15.10.1998 Original published format: JP 29363498 | [2000/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0994399 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0994399 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
G01D9/005 (EP,KR,US);
F17D3/00 (KR);
G05B19/0423 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] | Title | German: | Überwachungssystem mit eingebauter Stromversorgung | [2000/16] | English: | Monitoring system with power supply built therein | [2000/16] | French: | Système de surveillance avec alimentation intégrée | [2000/16] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 13.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/29] | 17.10.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.05.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/29] | Appeal following examination | 05.12.2006 | Appeal received No. T0764/07 | 22.02.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.05.2009 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 24.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.04.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | EP09158961.4 / EP2098923 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4347976 (JAKOBSEN JAKOB S) [Y] 4,5 * the whole document * [A] 1-3,6-8; | [A]US5481481 (FREY DONALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,2,4-6 * * column 1, line 11 - column 3, line 13 *; | [YA]US5606513 (LOUWAGIE BENNETT L [US], et al) [Y] 6 * figure - * * column 3, line 28 - line 57 * * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 46 * * column 8, line 21 - column 11, line 59 * [A] 1-5,7,8; | [X] - DANFOSS INSTRUMENTATION, "MASSFLO MASS FLOWMETER", DATA SHEET, (199606), XP002144411 [X] 1-3,8 * pages 2-4 * * pages 11-17 * * page 19 * * pages 21-23 * | [XY] - DANFOSS INSTRUMENTATION, "SONOFLO ULTRASONIC FLOWMETERS", DATA SHEET, (199509), XP002144410 [X] 1-3,7,8 * page 2 * * page 4 * * pages 10-17 * * page 25 * [Y] 4-6 | [A] - CHOW C W K ET AL, "An intelligent sensor system for the determination of ammonia using flow injection analysis", LABORATORY AUTOMATION & INFORMATION MANAGEMENT,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., AMSTERDAM, (19970601), vol. 33, no. 1, ISSN 1381-141X, pages 17 - 27, XP004086292 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 19 - page 23 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1381-141X(97)00004-X | [A] - FISHER-ROSEMOUNT, "CONTRÔLEURS NUMÉRIQUES FIELDVUE", NOTICE PRODUIT PF62.1:DVC5000-F, (199708), XP002144566 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |