EP0982302 - Delta 6,7-taxols antineoplastic use and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kelly, Robert C. 936 East Gull Lake Drive Augusta, Michigan / US | 02 /
Johnson, Roy A. 67 Marin Avenue Sausalito, California 94965 / US | 03 /
Skulnick, Harvey I. 1745 Old Deer Run Kalamazoo, Michigan 49009 / US | 04 /
Nidy, Eldon G. 3103 Morgan Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | [2003/51] |
Former [2000/09] | 01 /
Kelly, Robert C. 936 East Gull Lake Drive Augusta, Michigan / US | ||
02 /
Johnson, Roy A. 2122 Frederick Avenue Kalamazoo, Michigan 49008 / US | |||
03 /
Skulnick, Harvey I. 1745 Old Deer Run Kalamazoo, Michigan 49009 / US | |||
04 /
Nidy, Eldon G. 3103 Morgan Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99118034.0 | 03.06.1994 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | US19930076337 | 11.06.1993 Original published format: US 76337 | US19930122974 | 17.09.1993 Original published format: US 122974 | WO1993US11827 | 13.12.1993 Original published format: PCT/US93/11827 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982302 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0982302 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982302 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D305/14, C07D263/04, C07D413/12, A61K31/335 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
C07D263/04 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
C07D263/06 (EP,US);
C07D305/14 (EP,US);
C07D407/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/09] | Extension states | SI | 01.10.1999 | Title | German: | Delta 6,7-Taxol Derivate antineoplastische Verwendung und diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammenstellungen | [2000/09] | English: | Delta 6,7-taxols antineoplastic use and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [2000/09] | French: | Delta 6,7-taxols usage antineoplastique et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 08.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94920688.2 / EP0703909 | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Request for further processing for: | 28.02.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 21.02.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.03.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]WO9209589 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR]) [DX] 1 * page 1 - page 15 *; | [PX]WO9316060 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR]) [PX] 4-6 * page 1 - page 6; claim - *; | [PX]WO9407877 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [PX] 1,4-8,11 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9407878 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [PX] 1,4-8,11 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9407879 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [PX] 1,4-8,11* the whole document *; | [PX]WO9410169 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [PX] 1,4-8,11 * the whole document *; | [X] - A. COMMERCON ET AL., "IMPROVED PROTECTION AND ESTERIFICATION OF A PRECURSOR OF THE TAXOTERE AND TAXOL SIDE CHAINS.", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, OXFORD GB, (199209), vol. 33, no. 36, pages 5185 - 5188, XP000650710 [X] 4 * page 5187 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)79128-3 |