EP0996206 - Distribution cabinet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Muschik, Hans Fichtenstrasse 21 85649 Hofolding / DE | [2000/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia Neidl-Stippler Patentanwaltskanzlei Rauchstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia Neidl-Stippler Patentanwaltskanzlei Rauchstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/17] | Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia, Dr. Rauchstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99118079.5 | 24.09.1999 | [2000/17] | Priority number, date | DE1998218507U | 18.10.1998 Original published format: DE 29818507 U | [2000/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0996206 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0996206 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/30 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
H02B1/30 (EP);
H02B1/308 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/27] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE | ||
Former [2001/02] | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI | ||
Former [2000/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verteilerschrank | [2000/17] | English: | Distribution cabinet | [2000/17] | French: | Armoire de distribution | [2000/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 20.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.12.2000 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.2000 | 05.12.2000 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.2000 | 05.12.2000 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.2000 | 05.12.2000 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.2000 | 05.12.2000 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.2000 | 05.12.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.2000 | 05.12.2000 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.2000 | 05.12.2000 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.2000 | 05.12.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.2000 | 05.12.2000 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.2000 | 05.12.2000 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.2000 | 05.12.2000 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.2000 | 05.12.2000 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.2000 | 05.12.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.11.2006 | FI | 22.11.2006 | FR | 22.11.2006 | GB | 22.11.2006 | IE | 22.11.2006 | IT | 22.11.2006 | NL | 22.11.2006 | DK | 22.02.2007 | SE | 22.02.2007 | GR | 23.02.2007 | ES | 05.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/52] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
FR | 22.11.2006 | ||
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
FR | 13.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
GR | 23.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
GB | 22.11.2006 | ||
IE | 22.11.2006 | ||
IT | 22.11.2006 | ||
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
DK | 22.02.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | ||
ES | 05.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | FI | 22.11.2006 | |
NL | 22.11.2006 | ||
SE | 22.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19500739 (BADER WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1,8 * column 4, line 41 - line 47 *; | [A]DE19639889 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,8* the whole document * |