EP0989151 - Process for producing polyurethane foam by using an organosilicon resin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/13] | Process for producing organosilicon resin, and process for producing polyurethane foam by using the organosilicon resin obtained by that process | ||
[2003/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kudo, Muneo, Silicone Denshi Zairyo Gijutsu K. Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 1-10 Hitomi,Ohaza Matsuida-machi, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Morioka, Shinichi, Silicone Denshi Zairyo Gijutsu Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 1-10 Hitomi,Ohaza Matsuida-machi, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | 03 /
Asai, Mitsuo, Silicone Denshi Zairyo Gijutsu K. Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd., 1-10 Hitomi,Ohaza Matsuida-machi, Usui-gun, Gunma-ken / JP | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Nicolai, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Postfach 95 01 60 81517 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/29] | von Füner, Nicolai, Dr., et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Patentanwälte Postfach 95 01 60 81517 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/13] | von Füner, Alexander, Prof.h.c. Dr., et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99118449.0 | 17.09.1999 | [2000/13] | Priority number, date | JP19980266846 | 21.09.1998 Original published format: JP 26684698 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0989151 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0989151 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0989151 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/06, C08J9/00 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
C08G77/10 (EP,US);
C08G77/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/03] |
Former [2000/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Polyurethanschaumstoffes unter Verwendung eines Organosiliciumharzes | [2003/45] | English: | Process for producing polyurethane foam by using an organosilicon resin | [2003/45] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une mousse de polyuréthane en utilisant une résine organosilicique | [2003/45] |
Former [2000/13] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Organosilikonharzes und seiner Anwendung bei einem Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Polyurethanschaums | ||
Former [2000/13] | Process for producing organosilicon resin, and process for producing polyurethane foam by using the organosilicon resin obtained by that process | ||
Former [2000/13] | Procédé de préparation d'une résine organosilicique et son emploi dans un procédé de préparation d'une mousse de polyuréthane | Examination procedure | 21.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 04.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04003059.5 / EP1424353 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4605446 (ISOZAKI OSAMU [JP]) [Y] 1-9,10-12 * column 3, formulae * * column 3, line 35 - line 36 * * column 3, line 51 - line 52 * * column 3, line 61 - line 63 * * column 4, line 2 - line 3 * * column 4, line 7 - line 8 * * example - * * claim - *; | JPH06192426 [ ] (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [D]JPH05194691 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]US4011189 (KEIL JOSEPH W) [Y] 1,10-12 * abstract * * column 3, line 31 - line 36 * * column 4, line 22 - line 32 * * claim 1 * | [Y] - HCA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002154146 [Y] 1-9,10-12 * abstract * | [Y] - HCA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002160442 [Y] 1,10-12 * abstract * |