EP1091208 - Method and apparatus for thermally analyzing a material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mettler-Toledo GmbH Im Langacher 8606 Greifensee / CH | [2001/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schawe, Jürgen Dr. Burgstrasse 6 8604 Volketswil / CH | 02 /
Alig, Ingo Dr. Meisenweg 22 64331 Weiterstadt / DE | 03 /
Lellinger, Dirk Dr. Haydnstr. 11 64331 Weiterstadt / DE | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/15] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II Aufgang 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99118982.0 | 27.09.1999 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1091208 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1091208 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/48 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
G01N25/4833 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die thermische Analyse eines Materials | [2002/17] | English: | Method and apparatus for thermally analyzing a material | [2001/15] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'analyse thermique d'un matériau | [2001/15] |
Former [2001/15] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Thermalanalyse eines Materials | Examination procedure | 22.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 22.12.2000 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.10.2002 | BE | 30.10.2002 | FI | 30.10.2002 | GR | 30.10.2002 | IT | 30.10.2002 | NL | 30.10.2002 | DK | 30.01.2003 | PT | 30.01.2003 | SE | 30.01.2003 | ES | 29.04.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 30.10.2002 | |
BE | 30.10.2002 | ||
FI | 30.10.2002 | ||
GR | 30.10.2002 | ||
NL | 30.10.2002 | ||
DK | 30.01.2003 | ||
PT | 30.01.2003 | ||
SE | 30.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 30.10.2002 | |
BE | 30.10.2002 | ||
FI | 30.10.2002 | ||
GR | 30.10.2002 | ||
NL | 30.10.2002 | ||
PT | 30.01.2003 | ||
SE | 30.01.2003 | ||
ES | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/51] | AT | 30.10.2002 | |
BE | 30.10.2002 | ||
FI | 30.10.2002 | ||
GR | 30.10.2002 | ||
NL | 30.10.2002 | ||
PT | 30.01.2003 | ||
SE | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | AT | 30.10.2002 | |
FI | 30.10.2002 | ||
GR | 30.10.2002 | ||
NL | 30.10.2002 | ||
PT | 30.01.2003 | ||
SE | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/37] | AT | 30.10.2002 | |
GR | 30.10.2002 | ||
NL | 30.10.2002 | ||
PT | 30.01.2003 | ||
SE | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 30.10.2002 | |
NL | 30.10.2002 | ||
PT | 30.01.2003 | ||
SE | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 30.10.2002 | |
PT | 30.01.2003 | ||
SE | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 30.01.2003 | |
SE | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 30.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0559362 (TA INSTR INC [US]) [AD] 1,5,14,18,20 * abstract *; | [A]EP0572164 (TA INSTR INC [US]) [A] 1,14 * page 5, lines 10-12 *; | [AD]WO9533200 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [AD] 1,5,14,18,20 * abstract *; | [AD]WO9533199 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [AD] 1,5,14,18,20 * abstract *; | [A]EP0701122 (TA INSTR INC [US]) [A] 1,14,18,20 * pages 2-4; figures 1,24,28-32 *; | [A]WO9618886 (CONSIGLIO NAZIONALE RICERCHE [IT], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A] - AMENGUAL A ET AL, "SYSTEME D'ANALYSE THERMIQUE ET D'ANALYSE CALORIMETRIQUE DIFFERENTIELLE (DSC): APPLICATION A L'ETUDE DES CYCLES D'HYSTERESIS PRESENTES PAR LES MATERIAUX A MEMOIRE DE FORME", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E. SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS,GB,IOP PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, (198907), vol. 22, no. 7, ISSN 0022-3735, page 433-437, XP000036046 [A] 1 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0022-3735/22/7/004 | Examination | US4507974 |