EP0998899 - Use of butylhydroxytoluene for stabilizing of flavones, flavanones or flavonoids, and synergistic mixtures , cosmetic and dermatological preparations containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.09.2003 [2003/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [2000/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Max, Heiner, Dr. Von-Eicken-Strasse 18A 22529 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Schönrock, Uwe, Dr. Lerchenweg 33 23886 Nahe / DE | 03 /
Stäb, Franz, Dr. Bäckerstrasse 3 21379 Echem / DE | 04 /
Untiedt, Sven, Dr. Eimsbüttler Chaussee 88 20259 Hamburg / DE | [2000/19] | Application number, filing date | 99119017.4 | 28.09.1999 | [2000/19] | Priority number, date | DE1998145266 | 01.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19845266 | [2000/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0998899 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00, A61K7/48 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
C09K15/08 (EP);
A61K8/4973 (EP);
A61K8/498 (EP);
A61K8/602 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP);
A61K2800/522 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/19] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Butylhydroxytoluol zur Stabilisierung von Flavonen, Flavanonen bzw. Flavonoiden, synergistische Gemische aus Flavonen, Flavanonen bzw. Flavonoiden und Butylhydroxytoluol sowie kosmetische und dermatologische Zubereitungen mit einem Gehalt an solchen Gemischen | [2000/19] | English: | Use of butylhydroxytoluene for stabilizing of flavones, flavanones or flavonoids, and synergistic mixtures , cosmetic and dermatological preparations containing them | [2000/19] | French: | Utilisation de butylhydroxytoluene pour stabiliser de flavones, flavanones ou de flavonoides, et mélanges synergiques, compositions cosmétiques et dermatologiques les contenant | [2000/19] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 13.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 18.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/39] | 22.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/39] | Request for further processing for: | 02.10.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.10.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0899820 ; | [A]JPH0899821 ; | [DA]DE4444238 (BEIERSDORF) [DA] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 8, & JP08099820 A 19960416 (KOSE) [X] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 8, & JP08099821 A 19960416 (SHISEIDO) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - F. STÄB ET AL, "Novel antioxidants: New strategies in product stabilization and skin protection", SEIFEN, OLE, FETTE, WACHSE, AUGSBURG DE, (19980901), vol. 124, no. 10, pages 604 - 613, XP000776931 [A] 1 * page 612 * |