EP0994163 - New metal complex pigments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/16] | Metal complex pigments | ||
[2001/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2000/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linke, Frank Dünnwalder Mauspfad 357 51069 Köln / DE | 02 /
Faubion, Kent Grillenweg 27 51381 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Herrmann, Udo, Dr. Melanderstrasse 13 41541 Dormagen / DE | 04 /
Sommer, Richard, Dr. Ackerstrasse 51 51519 Odenthal / DE | [2000/16] | Application number, filing date | 99119100.8 | 04.10.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | DE1998147586 | 15.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19847586 | DE1999124763 | 29.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19924763 | [2000/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0994163 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0994163 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C09B45/14, // C09B67/00, C09B63/00, C08K5/3462 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
C09B67/0015 (EP,US);
C09B62/255 (KR);
C09B45/14 (EP,US);
C09B67/0029 (EP,US);
D06P1/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/01] |
Former [2000/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Neue Metallkomplexpigmente | [2000/16] | English: | New metal complex pigments | [2001/46] | French: | Nouveaux pigments de complexes métalliques | [2001/46] |
Former [2000/16] | Metal complex pigments | ||
Former [2000/16] | Pigments de complexes métalliques | Examination procedure | 19.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 06.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 07.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Request for further processing for: | 16.04.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 16.04.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.05.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 29.01.2003 | GB | 29.01.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 29.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0073463 (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * examples 29,31; claim - *; | [AD]EP0074515 (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * examples 10,13; claim - *; | [A]EP0839879 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 33 - line 40; claims 1,2,7-12 *; | [A]FR2121048 (BAYER AG) [A] 1-10 * example -; claim - * |