EP0992330 - Cooling device attached to molding machine with rotary turret block [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.01.2009 [2009/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husky Injection Molding Systems S.A. Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 3401 Dudelange / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states Husky Injection Molding Systems S.A. Technical Center Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 3401 Dudelange / LU | ||
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states HUSKY INJECTION MOLDING SYSTEMS LTD. 500 Queen Street South Bolton Ontario L7E 5S5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ing, Ronald 909 Royal York Road Etobicoke, Ontario M8Y 2V8 / CA | 02 /
Jacovich, William J. 793 Hollander Road Newmarket, Ontario L3Y 8H4 / CA | 03 /
Galt, John 68 MacTaggart Dr. Nobleton, Ontario L0G 1N0 / CA | 04 /
Bourque, Jacques P. 79 Gray Avenue Alliston, Ontario L9R 1P5 / CA | 05 /
Ilmonen, Robert Taylor 3950 Milkwood Crescent Mississauga Ontario L5N 8H2 / CA | [2003/20] |
Former [2000/15] | 01 /
Ing, Ronald 909 Royal York Road Etobicoke, Ontario M8Y 2V8 / CA | ||
02 /
Jacovich, William J. 793 Hollander Road Newmarket, Ontario L3Y 8H4 / CA | |||
03 /
Galt, John 68 MacTaggart Dr. Nobleton, Ontario L0G 1N0 / CA | |||
04 /
Bourque, Jacques P. 79 Gray Avenue Alliston, Ontario L9R 1P5 / CA | |||
05 /
Ilmonen, Robert Taylor 40 Fountain Head Road North York, Ontario M3J 2V1 / CA | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2008/16] |
Former [2008/14] | Dearling, Bruce Clive, et al Husky Injection Molding Systems SA Technical Center Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 3401 Dudelange / LU | ||
Former [2007/02] | Vossius, Corinna, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/47] | Dearling, Bruce Clive, et al Husky Injection Molding Systems SA Technical Center Zone Industrielle Riedgen B.P. 93 3401 Dudelange / LU | ||
Former [2000/15] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer. nat. Dr. Weiss, Weiss & Brecht Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99119167.7 | 06.10.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | US19980167699 | 07.10.1998 Original published format: US 167699 | [2004/52] |
Former [2000/15] | US19980167669 | 07.10.1998 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0992330 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0992330 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | [2003/02] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP0992330 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C35/16, B29C45/04, B29C45/40, B29C45/72 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
B29C35/16 (EP);
B29C45/045 (EP);
B29C45/7207 (EP);
B29K2105/253 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/15] | B29C35/16, B29C45/04, B29C45/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | An einer Formmaschine mit Revolverkopf befestigtes Kühlungsgerät | [2000/15] | English: | Cooling device attached to molding machine with rotary turret block | [2000/15] | French: | Dispositif de refroidissement monté sur une machine de moulage à tourelle | [2000/15] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/36] | 18.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US4729732 (HUGHES GARY ET AL) [DX] 1-25 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 29; figures 1,1A,2 *; | [DXA]US5728409 (ARNOTT ROBIN ET AL) [DX] 12 * column 4, line 34 - column 7, line 36; figure 8 * [A] 1-11,13-25; | [XA]US4786455 (KRISHNAKUMAR SUPPAYAN M ET AL) [X] 12 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 56; figures 1,2,6 * [A] 1-11,13-25; | [A]GB2046657 (EMHART IND) [A] 1-25 * page 2, line 113 - page 3, line 73; figures 1-11 *; | [A]US4140464 (DUGA ROBERT J ET AL) [A] 1-25 * column 4, line 44 - column 6, line 22; figures 1-10 * |