EP0992246 - Sterilisation tunnel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pennekamp, Ingbert Hammersbachweg 82 74564 Crailsheim / DE | 02 /
Windsheimer, Manfred Helmshofen 15 74589 Satteldorf / DE | [2000/15] | Application number, filing date | 99119407.7 | 30.09.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | DE1998146277 | 08.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19846277 | [2000/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0992246 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0992246 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0992246 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/04, B65B55/06 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
B65B55/06 (EP,US);
A61L2/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | Sterilisiertunnel | [2000/15] | English: | Sterilisation tunnel | [2000/15] | French: | Tunnel de stérilisation | [2000/15] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 24.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 08.12.2004 | FR | 08.12.2004 | GB | 08.12.2004 | IE | 08.12.2004 | NL | 08.12.2004 | DK | 08.03.2005 | GR | 08.03.2005 | SE | 08.03.2005 | ES | 19.03.2005 | PT | 08.05.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/18] | FI | 08.12.2004 | |
FR | 08.12.2004 | ||
GB | 08.12.2004 | ||
IE | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
SE | 08.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 08.12.2004 | |
FR | 08.12.2004 | ||
GB | 08.12.2004 | ||
IE | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 08.12.2004 | |
GB | 08.12.2004 | ||
IE | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 08.12.2004 | |
GB | 08.12.2004 | ||
IE | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 08.12.2004 | |
IE | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 08.12.2004 | |
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 08.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2214080 (HAMBA MASCHF) [A] 1-3* figure 1; claim -- *; | [A]DE2735532 (BAYER AG) [A] 1-3 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4131258 (SIEDLER TORSTEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0570946 (WILHELM BAUSCH ROLF STROEBEL S [DE]) [A] 1-3 * column 4, line 55 - column 7, line 18; figure 1 * |