EP0997386 - Container closure for a storage can [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2005 [2005/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEIFHEIT Aktiengesellschaft Leifheitstrasse 56377 Nassau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states LEIFHEIT Aktiengesellschaft Leifheitstrasse D-56377 Nassau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schülein, Rolf Günter Hauptstrasse 91 56379 Singhofen / DE | 02 /
Zimmer, Jürgen Im Römerkastell 33 56077 Koblenz / DE | 03 /
Bruchschmidt, Frank Auf dem Werth 31 56132 Dausenau / DE | [2000/18] | Application number, filing date | 99119415.0 | 30.09.1999 | [2000/18] | Priority number, date | DE1998150035 | 30.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19850035 | [2000/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0997386 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/08 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
B65D47/0847 (EP);
B65D2251/1008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, LI, NL [2001/03] |
Former [2000/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Behälterverschluss für eine Vorratsdose | [2000/18] | English: | Container closure for a storage can | [2000/18] | French: | Fermeture de récipient pour un conteneur de stockage | [2000/18] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 06.11.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DE, DK, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE | 11.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/47] | 02.03.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/47] | 03.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.12.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.12.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4615462 (WEISS ERICH ET AL) [A] 1 * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 3; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4723693 (DECOSTER PIETER K J) [A] 1 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 40; figure - *; | [A]US5219100 (BECK JAMES M ET AL) [A] 1 * column 6, line 6 - line 23; figures 5,6 *; | [A]EP0869075 (DART IND INC) [A] 1 * column 5, line 28 - line 56; figure 5 *; | [A]EP0538573 (WEENER PLASTIK GMBH CO KG) [A] 1 * abstract * |