EP0994471 - Head arrangement for multitrack recording with integrated tape guidance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2000/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Gunter Am Ammelbach 22 78078 Niedereschach / DE | 02 /
Oldermann, Klaus Werner-von-Siemens-Strasse 3/1 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Arnold, Klaus-Peter, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Arnold, Klaus-Peter, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2005/30] | Arnold, Klaus-Peter, Dr., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2000/16] | Rossmanith, Manfred, Dr., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Licensing & Intellectual Property, Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 99119502.5 | 01.10.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | DE1998146878 | 13.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19846878 | [2000/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0994471 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0994471 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | [2001/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/105, G11B15/62, // G11B5/10, G11B5/48 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
G11B11/10554 (EP,US);
G11B15/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/43] |
Former [2000/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kopfanordnung für Mehrfachspuraufzeichnung mit integrierter Bandführung | [2000/16] | English: | Head arrangement for multitrack recording with integrated tape guidance | [2000/16] | French: | Arrangement de tête pour l'enregistrement multi-pistes avec guidage de bande intégré | [2000/16] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/38] | 07.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/09] | 23.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0323188 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,6* the whole document *; | [A]WO9800838 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,6 * page 8, line 5 - line 23; figure 5 *; | [X]EP0818774 (THOMSON BRANDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,6 * column 7, line 7 - line 31; figures 8,9 *; | [A] - MAURICE F ET AL, "384 TRACKS DIGITAL RECORDER FOR CONSUMER VIDEO USE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS. (ICCE),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19920602), vol. CONF. 11, ISBN 0-7803-0480-2, pages 48 - 49, XP000369179 [A] 1 * figure . * | [A] - MAILLOT C ET AL, "HIGH TRACK DENSITY MAGNETO-OPTICAL READOUT OF MAGNETIC TAPES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19940301), vol. 30, no. 2, ISSN 0018-9464, pages 326 - 330, XP000473181 [A] 1 * page 326, column L, paragraph 4 * * page 327; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/20.312281 |