EP1088580 - Process of drying filtercakes in filter chambers of a filter press and filter press for carrying out said process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | Revocation of patent | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lenser Filtration GmbH & Co. Breslauer Strasse 8 89250 Senden / DE | [2001/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buhl, Rolf F. Longericher Hauptstrasse 45 a 50739 Köln / DE | 02 /
Weiler, Manfred Beethovenstrasse 2 89250 Senden / DE | 03 /
Zhu, Qian Dr. Fenggu Road 205/20/202 Shanghai / CN | 04 /
Zick, Mathias Haselnussweg 23 89250 Senden / DE | 05 /
Heckl, Franz Sonnenstrasse 8 89250 Senden / DE | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Dziewior, Joachim, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Hermann Fay Dr. Joachim Dziewior Postfach 1767 89007 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Dziewior, Joachim, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Hermann Fay Dr. Joachim Dziewior Postfach 1767 89007 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 99119606.4 | 02.10.1999 | [2001/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1088580 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1088580 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D25/21, B01D25/28, B01D35/18 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
B01D35/18 (EP);
B01D25/215 (EP);
B01D25/284 (EP);
B01D25/285 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Trocknung von in Filterkammern einer Filterpresse aufgebauten Filterkuchen sowie Filterpresse zur Durchführung des Verfahrens | [2001/14] | English: | Process of drying filtercakes in filter chambers of a filter press and filter press for carrying out said process | [2001/14] | French: | Procédé pour le séchage de gâteaux de filtration dans des chambres de filtration de filtre-presse et filtre-presse pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 03.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE NETZSCH-Filtrationstechnik GmbH Gebrüder Netzsch Strasse 19 95100 Selb / DE | 02
09.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE dehydry Anlagenbau AG Mühlhauserstrasse 96 4056 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Wagner, Kilian Westphal - Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE NETZSCH-Filtrationstechnik GmbH Gebrüder Netzsch Strasse 19 95100 Selb / DE | ||
02
09.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE dehydry Anlagenbau AG Mühlhauserstrasse 96 4056 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Wagner, Kilian Westphal - Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte, Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 29.11.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.05.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 27.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M07) | 07.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 12.03.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.12.2003 | GR | 17.03.2004 | LU | 02.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | [2007/18] |
Former [2005/45] | GR | 17.03.2004 | |
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | GR | 17.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2258621 (EDWARDS & JONES [GB]) [Y] 1,3,4,7,8 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 2 *; | [A]DE4224648 (ESCHER WYSS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,8 * column 2, line 55 - column 4, line 19; figures 1A-1C *; | [A]DE4136906 (LENSER KUNSTSTOFF PRESS [DE]) [A] 6* the whole document *; | [Y] - RUF J ET AL, "DAMPFDRUCKENTWAESSERUNG IN EIENER HEISSEN FILTERPRESSE. VAPOUR PRESSURE DEWATERING IN A HOT FILTER PRESS", AUFBEREITUNGS TECHNIK,DE,VERLAG FUER AUFBEREITUNG SCHIRMER UND ZEH. WIESBADEN, (19970801), vol. 38, no. 8, ISSN 1443-9302, pages 411 - 416, XP000697437 [Y] 1,3,4,7,8 * 3. Technische Umsetzung, 4. Entfeuchtungsergebnisse * |