EP0992353 - Method and apparatus for printing onto a continuously advancing web of work material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, IT, LI | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gerber Technology, Inc. 24 Industrial Park Road West Tolland Connecticut 06084 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states Gerber Technology, Inc. 24 Industrial Park Road West Tolland, Connecticut 06084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plumley, Bruce A. 52 Olander Lane Middletown, CT 06457 / US | 02 /
Stein, Darryl Colburn 530 Lake Road Andover, CT 06232 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99119634.6 | 04.10.1999 | [2000/15] | Priority number, date | US19980166314 | 05.10.1998 Original published format: US 166314 | US19990245617 | 05.02.1999 Original published format: US 245617 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0992353 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0992353 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J19/14, B41J19/20 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
B41J25/001 (EP);
B41J11/008 (EP);
B41J11/42 (EP);
B41J19/142 (EP);
B41J19/16 (EP);
B41J19/202 (EP);
B41J3/28 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Drucken auf eine durchlaufende Materialbahn | [2000/15] | English: | Method and apparatus for printing onto a continuously advancing web of work material | [2000/15] | French: | Procédure et appareil pour imprimer sur un matériau de bande défilant en continu | [2000/15] | Examination procedure | 04.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 04.10.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.09.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 20.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.2001 | BE | 01.08.2001 | CH | 01.08.2001 | CY | 01.08.2001 | FI | 01.08.2001 | IT | 01.08.2001 | LI | 01.08.2001 | NL | 01.08.2001 | IE | 04.10.2001 | LU | 04.10.2001 | MC | 04.10.2001 | DK | 01.11.2001 | SE | 01.11.2001 | GR | 02.11.2001 | PT | 05.11.2001 | ES | 28.02.2002 | [2008/17] |
Former [2005/01] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
BE | 01.08.2001 | ||
CY | 01.08.2001 | ||
FI | 01.08.2001 | ||
NL | 01.08.2001 | ||
IE | 04.10.2001 | ||
LU | 04.10.2001 | ||
MC | 04.10.2001 | ||
DK | 01.11.2001 | ||
SE | 01.11.2001 | ||
GR | 02.11.2001 | ||
PT | 05.11.2001 | ||
ES | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2004/42] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
BE | 01.08.2001 | ||
CY | 01.08.2001 | ||
FI | 01.08.2001 | ||
NL | 01.08.2001 | ||
IE | 04.10.2001 | ||
LU | 04.10.2001 | ||
MC | 04.10.2001 | ||
DK | 01.11.2001 | ||
SE | 01.11.2001 | ||
PT | 05.11.2001 | ||
ES | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
BE | 01.08.2001 | ||
CY | 01.08.2001 | ||
FI | 01.08.2001 | ||
NL | 01.08.2001 | ||
LU | 04.10.2001 | ||
MC | 04.10.2001 | ||
DK | 01.11.2001 | ||
SE | 01.11.2001 | ||
PT | 05.11.2001 | ||
ES | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
BE | 01.08.2001 | ||
CY | 01.08.2001 | ||
FI | 01.08.2001 | ||
NL | 01.08.2001 | ||
MC | 04.10.2001 | ||
DK | 01.11.2001 | ||
SE | 01.11.2001 | ||
PT | 05.11.2001 | ||
ES | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
BE | 01.08.2001 | ||
FI | 01.08.2001 | ||
NL | 01.08.2001 | ||
MC | 04.10.2001 | ||
DK | 01.11.2001 | ||
SE | 01.11.2001 | ||
PT | 05.11.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
BE | 01.08.2001 | ||
FI | 01.08.2001 | ||
NL | 01.08.2001 | ||
MC | 04.10.2001 | ||
SE | 01.11.2001 | ||
PT | 05.11.2001 | ||
FR | 28.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/43] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
BE | 01.08.2001 | ||
FI | 01.08.2001 | ||
MC | 04.10.2001 | ||
SE | 01.11.2001 | ||
PT | 05.11.2001 | ||
FR | 28.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/29] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
BE | 01.08.2001 | ||
FI | 01.08.2001 | ||
SE | 01.11.2001 | ||
PT | 05.11.2001 | ||
FR | 28.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
FI | 01.08.2001 | ||
SE | 01.11.2001 | ||
PT | 05.11.2001 | ||
FR | 28.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/20] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
FI | 01.08.2001 | ||
SE | 01.11.2001 | ||
FR | 28.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/18] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
FI | 01.08.2001 | ||
FR | 28.12.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 01.08.2001 | |
FI | 01.08.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3742846 (KNAPPE L) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 42 - line 60 * * column 2, line 36 - column 5, line 14; figure - *; | [A]DE3446226 (OLYMPIA WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * page 7; figure - *; | [A]DE4120293 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1* column 3, line 16 - column 6, line 26; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0589669 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 34 *; | [A]EP0829368 (SCITEX DIGITAL PRINTING INC [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 29 - column 6, line 35; figures 3-8 * |