EP1024318 - Reverse seal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.07.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freudenberg-NOK General Partnership 47690 Anchor Court Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | [2000/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakata, David 37154 Muirfield Drive Livonia, MI 48152 / US | 02 /
Griswold, Milton 412 Doe Heights Clarkesville, GA 30523 / US | 03 /
Johnston, David E. 2 Sarah Lane HC58 Box 287-2, East Hebron, NH 03232 / US | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Moldenhauer, Herbert Carl Freudenberg Patente und Marken Höhnerweg 2-4 69465 Weinheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Moldenhauer, Herbert c/o Carl Freudenberg, Patente und Marken 69465 Weinheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 99119790.6 | 06.10.1999 | [2000/31] | Priority number, date | US19990117723P | 29.01.1999 Original published format: US 117723 P | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1024318 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1024318 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | [2001/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
F16J15/3244 (EP,US);
F16J15/3228 (EP,US);
F16J15/328 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/03] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dichtring mit Förderwirkung | [2000/31] | English: | Reverse seal | [2000/31] | French: | Joint avec effet de refoulement | [2000/31] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/35] | 28.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.12.2001 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.12.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.12.2001 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE6916004U (STEPHAN UND SOEHNE A [DE]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 10 * * figure . *; | [A]DE3640346 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 11 ** figure 1 *; | [A]EP0284496 (PROCAL [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 15-36 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US4886281 (EHRMANN PETER [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 2 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE4243828 (BUSAK & LUYKEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 * |