EP0995452 - Topical intra-uterine anesthesia device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vancaillie, Thierry G. 60, Sugarloaf Crescent Castlecrag NSW 2068 / AU | [2000/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/17] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99120072.6 | 19.10.1999 | [2000/17] | Priority number, date | US19980175233 | 20.10.1998 Original published format: US 175233 | [2000/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0995452 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0995452 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61M3/04, A61M19/00, A61M3/02 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
A61M3/0279 (EP,US);
A61M19/00 (EP,US);
A61M2210/1433 (EP,US);
A61M3/0262 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/17] | A61M3/04, A61M19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/40] |
Former [2000/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur örtliche intrauterine Anästhesiebehandlung und deren Verfahren | [2000/17] | English: | Topical intra-uterine anesthesia device | [2000/17] | French: | Dispositif d'anesthésie locale intra-utérine | [2000/17] | Examination procedure | 17.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 22.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/34] | 10.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BE633372 (TOBIE MERTENS) [X] 1 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 13; figure - *; | [A]US3626928 (BARRINGER HULBERT VAN RENSSELA, et al) [A] 1* column 5, line 48 - column 6, line 17; figure 2 *; | [XY]US4071027 (MEADOR LAWRENCE DEAN) [X] 1,2,4,7 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 26; figures 1-5 * [Y] 3,5,6; | [X]US4432758 (FINEGOLD AARON N [US]) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 37; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]DE3516830 (HUBMANN MAX, et al) [Y] 6 * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 10; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5338297 (KOCUR WALTER [US], et al) [Y] 3 * column 2, line 25 - line 37; figure 4 *; | [Y]US5569241 (EDWARDS STUART D [US]) [Y] 5 * column 5, line 9 - line 10; figure 1 * |