EP0995653 - Brake device for vehicle having barhandle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.2007 [2007/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSIN KOGYO CO., LTD. 840, Ohaza Kokubu Ueda-shi Nagano-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states NISSIN KOGYO CO., LTD. No. 840, Ohaza Kokubu Ueda-shi Nagano-ken / JP | ||
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states NISSIN KOGYO CO., LTD. No. 840, Ohaza Kokubu Ueda-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuno, Isao c/o Nissin Kogyo Co., Ltd., No. 840, Kokubu Ueda-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99120084.1 | 20.10.1999 | [2000/17] | Priority number, date | JP19980297896 | 20.10.1998 Original published format: JP 29789698 | [2000/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0995653 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0995653 | Date: | 31.10.2001 | [2001/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0995653 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60T7/08, B60T11/10, B62K11/14, B62K23/02, B62L3/08 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
B60T11/16 (EP);
B60T11/06 (EP);
B60T13/64 (EP);
B60T7/10 (EP);
B62L3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [2002/29] |
Former [2000/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bremsvorrichtung für Fahrzeug mit Rohrlenker | [2000/17] | English: | Brake device for vehicle having barhandle | [2000/17] | French: | Dispositif de freinage pour véhicule avec guidon | [2000/17] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/23] | 02.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3812977 (PIAGGIO & C SPA) [A] 1 * column 5, line 17 - column 6, line 30; figure 2 *; | [A]DE19535116 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 60; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB2154292 (KUO CHUO CHANG) [A] 1 * page 1, line 68 - page 2, line 9; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2720992 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * column A; figure 2 * |