EP0993932 - Press with toggle drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STRIP's d.o.o. Podjetje za svetovanje trzenje in proizvodnjo Mlinse 33 1411 Izlake / SI | [2000/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seslar, Leopold, Ing. Podlipovica 12 1411 Izlake / SI | 02 /
Smrkolj, Jozef, Dipl.-Ing. Mlinse 33 1411 Izlake / SI | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99120146.8 | 08.10.1999 | [2000/16] | Priority number, date | DE1998146951 | 12.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19846951 | [2000/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0993932 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0993932 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B30B1/14, B30B15/00 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
B30B15/0035 (EP);
B30B1/14 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/16] | B30B1/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/16] | Title | German: | Presse mit kniehebelantrieb | [2000/16] | English: | Press with toggle drive | [2000/16] | French: | Presse entrainée par genouillère | [2000/16] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 01.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/48] | 18.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2515105 (MUELLER WEINGARTEN MASCHF) [X] 1-3,5 * figure -; claims 1,3,5-7 * [Y] 4,6-9; | [Y]DE3736353 (KLASCHKA RUDOLF) [Y] 4 * column 3, line 17 - line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5588344 (CHUN VICTOR L) [Y] 6-9 * abstract *; | [A]DE157536 (GEBR. SACHSENBERG GMBH) [A] 1,2 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]US2986947 (SLETTENGREN A. I. K.) [A] 1,4 * figure - *; | [AD]DE2407438 (SCHULER GMBH L) [AD] 1,2 * figure - * |