EP0996087 - Device and method for manufacturing a track, namely a transponder strip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states bielomatik Leuze GmbH + Co. KG Daimlerstrasse 6-10 72639 Neuffen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | For all designated states bielomatik Leuze GmbH + Co. KG Daimlerstrasse 6-10 72639 Neuffen / DE | ||
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states BIELOMATIK LEUZE GmbH + Co. Daimlerstrasse 6-10 D-72639 Neuffen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bohn, Martin Lüftestrasse 48 72762 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
Scheller, Wolfgang Seligenstadter Weg 9 97241 Oberpleichfeld / DE | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99120763.0 | 20.10.1999 | [2000/17] | Priority number, date | DE1998148716 | 22.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19848716 | [2000/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0996087 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0996087 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0996087 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, B07C5/344 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
G06K19/07718 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K7/0095 (EP,US);
Y10T156/12 (EP,US);
Y10T156/13 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53465 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2074 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2083 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2085 (EP,US);
Y10T83/2181 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/17] | G06K19/077 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2001/51] |
Former [2000/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bearbeitung einer Bahn, insbesondere eines Transponder-Streifens | [2000/17] | English: | Device and method for manufacturing a track, namely a transponder strip | [2000/17] | French: | Appareil et procédé de fabrication d'une trace, nottament une bande pour un transpondeur | [2000/17] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 29.09.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 10.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0720123 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19632795 (CICOREL S A [CH], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |