EP0997926 - Plasma treatment apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP | [2006/01] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sawada, Yasushi 36-4 Narita-Higashigoaka Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0002 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Kosuke 24-1-103 Suehiro-cho Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0009 / JP | 03 /
Kitamura, Hiroaki 1-14-4-302 Jinai-cho Moriguchi-shi, Osaka 570-0056 / JP | 04 /
Inoue, Yoshitami 6-12 Nisshin-cho Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0028 / JP | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2000/18] | Application number, filing date | 99120797.8 | 20.10.1999 | [2000/18] | Priority number, date | JP19980304003 | 26.10.1998 Original published format: JP 30400398 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0997926 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0997926 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0997926 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
H01J37/32009 (EP,US);
H01J37/32348 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32541 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32559 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32724 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/05] |
Former [2000/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Apparat und Verfahren zur Plasmabehandlung | [2000/18] | English: | Plasma treatment apparatus and method | [2000/18] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour le TRAITEMENT AU PLASMA | [2000/18] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 25.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0431951 (JAPAN RES DEV CORP [JP]) [A] 1,14,16 * column 3, lines 5-58; figures 1-3 *; | [D]JPH04358976 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]US5369336 (KOINUMA HIDEOMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,14,16 * column 3, lines 41-64; figures 1,2 * * abstract *; | [A]WO9428568 (UNIV TENNESSEE [US]); | [A]WO9832154 (BALZERS HOCHVAKUUM [LI], et al) |