EP0978821 - Computerized music system having software and hardware sound sources [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 430 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 430 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wachi, Masatada c/o Yamaha Corporation, 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 430 / JP | 02 /
Yamada, Hideo c/o Yamaha Corporation, 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 430 / JP | 03 /
Hirano, Masashi c/o Yamaha Corporation, 10-1 Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 430 / JP | [2000/06] | Representative(s) | Kehl, Günther Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/06] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99120824.0 | 03.06.1996 | [2000/06] | Priority number, date | JP19950139526 | 06.06.1995 Original published format: JP 13952695 | JP19950253493 | 29.09.1995 Original published format: JP 25349395 | [2000/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0978821 | Date: | 09.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0978821 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G10H7/00 | [2000/06] | CPC: |
G10H7/004 (EP,KR,US);
G10H7/006 (EP,KR,US);
G10H2230/041 (EP,KR,US);
G10H2240/241 (EP,KR,US);
G10H2240/271 (EP,KR,US);
G10H2240/291 (EP,KR,US);
G10H2240/305 (EP,KR,US);
G10H2240/311 (EP,KR,US);
G10H2240/315 (EP,KR,US);
G10H2250/511 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2000/06] | Title | German: | Rechnermusiksystem mit Software und Hardware Tonerzeugern | [2000/06] | English: | Computerized music system having software and hardware sound sources | [2000/06] | French: | Système de calcul musical avec sources sonores logicielles et matérielles | [2000/06] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 28.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96108875.4 / EP0747877 | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8001215 (MICROSKILL LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-3* page 12, line 3 - page 13, line 5 *; | [A]US5376752 (LIMBERIS ALEXANDER J [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 43, line 8 - column 44, line 54; figure 1 * |