EP0975170 - Signal transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2000/04] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oshima, Mitsuaki 115-3 Katsura, Minamitatsumi-cho, Nishikyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu 615 / JP | [2000/04] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/04] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99121007.1 | 26.03.1992 | [2000/04] | Priority number, date | JP19910067298 | 27.03.1991 Original published format: JP 6729891 | JP19910095813 | 25.04.1991 Original published format: JP 9581391 | JP19910155650 | 29.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15565091 | JP19910182236 | 23.07.1991 Original published format: JP 18223691 | JP19920060739 | 17.03.1992 Original published format: JP 6073992 | [2000/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0975170 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0975170 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N7/04, H04N7/08, H04N7/12, H04L27/34 | [2000/04] | CPC: |
H04L1/006 (EP,US);
H04L1/004 (EP,US);
H04L27/02 (EP,US);
H04L27/183 (EP,US);
H04L27/2602 (EP,US);
H04L27/2603 (EP,US);
H04L27/2604 (EP,US);
H04L27/34 (EP,US);
H04L27/3488 (EP,US);
H04N21/2383 (EP,US);
H04N21/2662 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/4344 (EP,US);
H04N21/4382 (EP,US);
H04N7/045 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/04] | Title | German: | Signalübertragungssystem | [2000/04] | English: | Signal transmission system | [2000/04] | French: | Système de transmission de signal | [2000/04] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 21.10.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2003 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 20.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92302627.2 / EP0506400 | EP96119060.0 / EP0766478 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.08.2003 | NL | 27.08.2003 | DE | 28.11.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2004/31] | NL | 27.08.2003 | |
DE | 28.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/13] | NL | 27.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4227152 (GODARD DOMINIQUE N, et al); | [Y]US4525846 (BREMER GORDON [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US4630287 (ARMSTRONG THOMAS [US]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US4751478 (YOSHIDA YASUHARU [JP]); | [A]US4891806 (FARIAS LUIS V [US], et al); | [A]US4903125 (PARKER MICHAEL A [GB]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]EP0365431 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * page 16, line 22 - line 39 *; | [Y]US4937844 (KAO MING-LUH [US]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 68 *; | [A]EP0392538 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]); | [E]EP0485105 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [E] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A] - HILL T ET AL, "A PERFORMANCE STUDY OF NLA 64-STATE QAM", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (198306), vol. COM-31, no. 6, ISSN 0090-6778, page 821-826, XP000758653 [A] 1-5 * paragraph I-III; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1983.1095894 |