EP1094053 - Method of preparing fluoroaromatic compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zelinsky Institute of Organic Chemistry 47 Leninsky Prospect Moscow 117913 / RU | For all designated states Samsung Atofina Co., Ltd. 411-1, Dokgod-Ri, Daesan-Up Seosan-Si, ChungNam 356-711 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/02] | For all designated states Zelinsky Institute of Organic Chemistry 47 Leninsky Prospect Moscow 117913 / RU | ||
For all designated states Samsung Atofina Co., Ltd. 411-1, Dokgod-Ri, Daesan-Up Seosan-Si, Chungnam 356-711 / KR | |||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Zelinsky Institute of Organic Chemistry 47 Leninsky Prospect Moscow 117913 / RU | ||
For all designated states Samsung General Chemicals Co., Ltd. San 222-2, Dokkot-li, Taesan-eup Seosan-kun, Chungnam 356-870 / KR | |||
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states Zelinsky Institute of Organic Chemistry 47 Leninsky Prospect Moscow 117913 / RU | ||
For all designated states Samsung General Chemicals Co., Ltd. San 222-2, Dokkot-li, Taesan-eup Seosan-kun, Chungcheongnam-do 356-870 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nefedov, Oleg Matveyevich Zelinsky Street 38, ap.80 Moscow 117334 / RU | 02 /
Volchkov, Nikolay Vasiljevich Khoroshevskoe Shosse, 82-8-24 Moscow 123007 / RU | 03 /
Lipkind, Mariya Borisovna Izumrudnaya Street 9, ap. 327 Moscow 12981 / RU | 04 /
Lee, Ho Seong 103-305 ,Luckyhana, Apt. Shinseong-dong Yuseong-ku, Taejeon / KR | 05 /
Park, Young Jun 102-605, Sejong Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-ku, Taejeon / KR | 06 /
Kim, Min Hwan 102-602, Daerimdure Apt. Shinseong-dong Yuseong-ku, Taejeon / KR | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99121167.3 | 22.10.1999 | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094053 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1094053 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/16, C07C51/58, C07C25/13, C07C17/25 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
C07C17/30 (EP,US);
C07C17/25 (EP,US);
C07C25/13 (EP,US);
C07C51/093 (EP,US);
C07C51/58 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/25, C07C25/13 (EP,US);
C07C17/30, C07C23/10 (US,EP);
C07C51/093, C07C63/70 (US,EP);
C07C51/58, C07C63/70 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/03] |
Former [2001/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von fluoroaromatischen Verbindungen | [2001/17] | English: | Method of preparing fluoroaromatic compounds | [2001/17] | French: | Procédé de production de composés fluoroaromatiques | [2001/17] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2000 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 14.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4754084 (WEIGERT FRANK J [US]) [DA] 1-9 * column 1, line 47 - column 3, line 59 *; | [DA]US5003103 (FERTEL LAWRENCE B [US], et al) [DA] 1-9 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0431373 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [DA] 1-9* abstract * |