EP1000671 - Process for avoiding paint dropping on articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linek, Rudolf Dipl.-Ing. Ludwig-Erhard-Strasse 25 38518 Gifhorn / DE | 02 /
Dannenberg, Rainer Wacholderweg 9 38112 Braunschweig / DE | [2001/31] |
Former [2000/20] | 01 /
Linek, Rudolf Dipl.-Ing. Ludwig-Erhard-Strasse 25 38518 Gifhorn / DE | Application number, filing date | 99121210.1 | 23.10.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | DE1998151467 | 09.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19851467 | [2000/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1000671 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1000671 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | [2003/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000671 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B05D5/00 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
B05D5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Vermeidung von Lacktropfen an Werkstücken | [2000/20] | English: | Process for avoiding paint dropping on articles | [2000/20] | French: | Procédé pour éviter la formation de gouttes de peinture sur des objets | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 06.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.08.2004 | FI | 18.08.2004 | GB | 18.08.2004 | IE | 18.08.2004 | NL | 18.08.2004 | AT | 23.10.2004 | LU | 23.10.2004 | BE | 31.10.2004 | CH | 31.10.2004 | LI | 31.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | DK | 18.11.2004 | GR | 18.11.2004 | SE | 18.11.2004 | ES | 29.11.2004 | PT | 18.01.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/18] | CY | 18.08.2004 | |
FI | 18.08.2004 | ||
GB | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
AT | 23.10.2004 | ||
LU | 23.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
GB | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
AT | 23.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
GB | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
NL | 18.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
GB | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
BE | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
GB | 18.08.2004 | ||
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
IE | 18.08.2004 | ||
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
ES | 29.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
DK | 18.11.2004 | ||
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
GR | 18.11.2004 | ||
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 18.08.2004 | |
SE | 18.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 18.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2359476 (GRAVLEY CHARLES K) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 42; claims 1,2,4-9 *; | [A]US2950990 (JOHNSON DONALD D) [A] 1-3,6-11* column 1, lines 16-66; figure 1; claim - *; | [A]US3341353 (JOHNSON JOHN R) [A] 1-3,6-11 * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 7; figure 4; claim - * |