EP1010605 - Front structure of an integral body and frame for an automobile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gure, Dietmar Talweg 2 71120 Grafenau / DE | 02 /
Lange, Dieter Zavelsteiner Weg 2/1 71106 Magstadt / DE | [2000/25] | Application number, filing date | 99121323.2 | 26.10.1999 | [2000/25] | Priority number, date | DE1998158303 | 17.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19858303 | [2000/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1010605 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1010605 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | [2002/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/08, B62D21/15, B62D21/11 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
B62D21/11 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/25] | B62D25/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/29] |
Former [2000/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorbaustruktur für eine selbsttragende Rohbaukarosserie eines Personenkraftwagens | [2000/25] | English: | Front structure of an integral body and frame for an automobile | [2000/25] | French: | Structure avant d'une carrosserie auto-porteuse d'un véhicule | [2000/25] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 12.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/34] | 05.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3940176 (ITO HIROSHI, et al) [A] 1-5 * figure 9 *; | [A]DE9002839U (FIAT AUTO S.P.A.) [A] 1,2* figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5372216 (TSUJI SEIICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * figures 8,9 *; | [A]US5472063 (WATANABE SHIGEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,4 * figure 18 *; | [XY]DE19510763 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]US5611569 (SEKIGUCHI YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * abstract * |