EP1000901 - Method for producing sulfuryl fluoride [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Fluor und Derivate GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [2002/32] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Solvay Fluor und Derivate GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 D-30173 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulz, Alf Torfweg 11 30900 Wedemark / DE | 02 /
Rieland, Matthias, Dr. In der Bebie 70 30539 Hannover / DE | 03 /
Hausmann, Eckhard Lenzbergweg 64B 30519 Hannover / DE | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/11] |
Former [2000/20] | Lauer, Dieter, Dr. Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 99121724.1 | 03.11.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | DE1998151999 | 11.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19851999 | [2000/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000901 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000901 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C01B17/45 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
C01B17/4576 (EP,US);
C01B9/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Sulfurylfluorid | [2000/20] | English: | Method for producing sulfuryl fluoride | [2000/20] | French: | Méthode de production de Fluorure de Sulfuryl | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 07.08.2002 | GR | 07.08.2002 | IE | 07.08.2002 | IT | 07.08.2002 | NL | 07.08.2002 | AT | 03.11.2002 | LU | 03.11.2002 | DK | 07.11.2002 | SE | 07.11.2002 | PT | 22.11.2002 | BE | 30.11.2002 | CY | 30.11.2002 | [2008/17] |
Former [2005/21] | FI | 07.08.2002 | |
GR | 07.08.2002 | ||
IE | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
AT | 03.11.2002 | ||
LU | 03.11.2002 | ||
DK | 07.11.2002 | ||
SE | 07.11.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2005/01] | GR | 07.08.2002 | |
IE | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
AT | 03.11.2002 | ||
LU | 03.11.2002 | ||
DK | 07.11.2002 | ||
SE | 07.11.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | GR | 07.08.2002 | |
IE | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
AT | 03.11.2002 | ||
LU | 03.11.2002 | ||
DK | 07.11.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/14] | GR | 07.08.2002 | |
IE | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
AT | 03.11.2002 | ||
DK | 07.11.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | GR | 07.08.2002 | |
IE | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
DK | 07.11.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 07.08.2002 | |
IE | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
DK | 07.11.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/42] | GR | 07.08.2002 | |
IE | 07.08.2002 | ||
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | GR | 07.08.2002 | |
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
PT | 22.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | GR | 07.08.2002 | |
NL | 07.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 07.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1000354 (FRITZ SEEL DR) [A] 1,4,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2643521 (ALLIED CHEM) [A] 1-6 * claim 1 *; | [DA] - Handbuch der Anorganischen Chemie, Schwefel, Teil B, Lieferung 3, WEINHEIM, 8. AUFLAGE, VERLAG CHEMIE, (1963), XP002130203 [DA] 1 * page 1729 - page 1730 * | [ ] - H. MOISSAN, P. LEBEAU, ANN. CHIM. PHYS., (1902), vol. 26, no. 7, pages 145 - 178 |