EP0983748 - Fertility monitoring method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/10] | Monitoring methods, devices and test kits | ||
[2002/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inverness Medical Switzerland GmbH Bundesplatz 10 6300 Zug / CH | [2002/34] |
Former [2002/18] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
Inverness Medical Switzerland GmbH Bundesplatz 1 6300 Zug / CH | ||
Former [2001/09] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
PT
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
IE
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For all designated states UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states UNIPATH LIMITED Wade Road Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 OPW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Catt, Michael, c/o Unipath Ltd Priory Business Park Bedford, MK4 3UP / GB | 02 /
Mundill, Paul Henry Charles 44 Ashby Drive Rushden, Northamptonshire NN10 9HH / GB | 03 /
Zhang, Zhi Gang 15 Hartshill Putnoe, Bedford MK41 9AL / GB | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Lipscombe, Martin John, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | Lipscombe, Martin John, et al Keith W Nash & Co, Pearl Assurance House, 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
Former [2000/26] | Evans, Jacqueline Gail Victoria, et al Unilever plc Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/10] | Butler, David John, et al Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99121753.0 | 24.06.1994 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | EP19930305220 | 02.07.1993 Original published format: EP 93305220 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0983748 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0983748 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0983748 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00, // G01N33/76, G01N33/74 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
G01N33/743 (EP);
A61B10/0012 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/10] | A61B10/00, G01N33/76, G01N33/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] | Title | German: | Überwachungsverfahren der Fertilität | [2002/21] | English: | Fertility monitoring method | [2002/21] | French: | Procédé de contrôle de la fertilité | [2002/21] |
Former [2000/10] | Überwachungsverfahren, Vorrichtungen und Test Kits | ||
Former [2000/10] | Monitoring methods, devices and test kits | ||
Former [2000/10] | Procédés de contrôle, dispositifs et kits | Examination procedure | 03.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 20.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94921625.3 / EP0706346 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 27.03.2003 | [2003/30] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.2003 | BE | 09.04.2003 | CH | 09.04.2003 | GR | 09.04.2003 | IT | 09.04.2003 | LI | 09.04.2003 | NL | 09.04.2003 | DK | 09.07.2003 | PT | 09.07.2003 | SE | 09.07.2003 | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/28] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
BE | 09.04.2003 | ||
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
GR | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
GR | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
DK | 09.07.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 09.04.2003 | |
CH | 09.04.2003 | ||
GR | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 09.04.2003 | |
GR | 09.04.2003 | ||
LI | 09.04.2003 | ||
NL | 09.04.2003 | ||
PT | 09.07.2003 | ||
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GR | 09.04.2003 | |
SE | 09.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 09.07.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]US4151833 (POLISHUK W Z [IL]) [DX] 3,4,6,9,27-29,31-34 * column 2, line 6 - line 24; figure 8 *; | [A]DE8805565U (UNILEVER NV); | [D]GB2204398 (UNILEVER PLC); | [A]EP0367615 (MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 22 - line 35 *; | [DXA]EP0385621 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [DX] 1-11,14,21-23,31-33,36-40 * the whole document * [A] 15-20,25,28-30; | [A]US5043888 (URIARTE JORGE E [US]) [A] 15-20 * column A *; | [A] - PAZ ET AL., "Determination of urinary luteinizing hormone for prediction of ovulation", GYNECOLOGIC AND OBSTETRIC INVESTIGATION, BASEL, (1990), vol. 29, pages 207 - 210, XP000874641 | [DA] - COLLINS ET AL., "Ovulation prediction and detectionby measurement of steroid glucuronides", PROC XTH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON FERTILITY AND STERILITY PUB MTB LTD, (1981), pages 19 - 33, XP000901877 |