EP1098155 - Process for operating a clinker cooler and clinker cooler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/19] | Clinker cooler | ||
[2004/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Claudius Peters Technologies GmbH Schanzenstrasse 40 21614 Buxtehude / DE | [2004/21] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states BMH Claudius Peters GmbH Schanzenstrasse 40 21614 Buxtehude / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klintworth, Klaus Finkenstrasse 29 21614 Buxtehude / DE | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99121757.1 | 03.11.1999 | [2001/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098155 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098155 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F27D15/02 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
F27D15/0213 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Brenngutkühlers sowie Brenngutkühler | [2004/21] | English: | Process for operating a clinker cooler and clinker cooler | [2004/21] | French: | Procédé pour refroidir du clinker et refroidisseur de clinker | [2004/21] |
Former [2001/19] | Kühler für Brenngut | ||
Former [2001/19] | Clinker cooler | ||
Former [2001/19] | Refroidisseur de clinker | Examination procedure | 06.09.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.10.2004 | ES | 06.10.2004 | FI | 06.10.2004 | FR | 06.10.2004 | GB | 06.10.2004 | IE | 06.10.2004 | IT | 06.10.2004 | NL | 06.10.2004 | SE | 06.10.2004 | AT | 03.11.2004 | LU | 03.11.2004 | BE | 30.11.2004 | CH | 30.11.2004 | LI | 30.11.2004 | MC | 30.11.2004 | DK | 06.01.2005 | GR | 06.01.2005 | PT | 06.03.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/18] | CY | 06.10.2004 | |
ES | 06.10.2004 | ||
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
FR | 06.10.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
SE | 06.10.2004 | ||
AT | 03.11.2004 | ||
LU | 03.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
FR | 06.10.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
AT | 03.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
AT | 03.11.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
CH | 30.11.2004 | ||
LI | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
BE | 30.11.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
MC | 30.11.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 06.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1108606 (POLYSIUS GMBH) [A] 1,9,10 * figure 1; claim - *; | [A]US3089688 (WERNER OSTBERG) [A] 1,9 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB926470 (KNAPSACK AG); | [A]DE1953415 (POLYSIUS AG); | [A]WO8401616 (WEDEL KARL VON [DE]) [A] 1,16 * figure . *; | [A]US4732561 (EIRING KARL [DE], et al); | [YA]EP0359108 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [Y] 1 * figure -; claim - * * figure 1; claim 2 * [A] 10,11; | [YA]EP0718578 (SMIDTH & CO AS F L [DK]) [Y] 1 * figure 9; claim - * * column 6, line 36 - line 41; figure 9 * [A] 14,15; | [X]EP0726440 (KRUPP POLYSIUS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * figure -; claim - * |