EP1003246 - Modular connector system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.12.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG Paderborner Strasse 175 32760 Detmold / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. Paderborner Strasse 175 32760 Detmold / DE | ||
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. Paderborner Strasse 175 D-32760 Detmold / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rantzsch, Manfred Hinter der Schiessmauer 6a 64853 Otzberg / DE | 02 /
Kamp, Achim Hanauer Strasse 41 63505 Langenselbold / DE | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Specht, Peter, et al Loesenbeck - Stracke - Specht - Dantz Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [2000/21] | Specht, Peter, Dipl.-Phys., et al Loesenbeck, Stracke, Loesenbeck, Patentanwälte, Jöllenbecker Strasse 164 33613 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 99121831.4 | 04.11.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | DE1998220771U | 20.11.1998 Original published format: DE 29820771 U | [2000/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1003246 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1003246 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | [2002/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1003246 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/514, H01R13/518 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
H01R13/506 (EP);
H01R13/514 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | Modulares Steckverbindersystem | [2000/21] | English: | Modular connector system | [2000/21] | French: | Système de connecteur modulaire | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 12.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.02.2005 | FI | 09.02.2005 | FR | 09.02.2005 | GB | 09.02.2005 | IE | 09.02.2005 | NL | 09.02.2005 | DK | 09.05.2005 | GR | 09.05.2005 | SE | 09.05.2005 | PT | 09.07.2005 | AT | 04.11.2005 | CY | 04.11.2005 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/23] | ES | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
GB | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
AT | 04.11.2005 | ||
CY | 04.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/21] | ES | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
GB | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
CY | 04.11.2005 | ||
Former [2007/18] | ES | 09.02.2005 | |
FI | 09.02.2005 | ||
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
GB | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | FI | 09.02.2005 | |
FR | 09.02.2005 | ||
GB | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 09.02.2005 | |
GB | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
NL | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 09.02.2005 | |
GB | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
GR | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 09.02.2005 | |
GB | 09.02.2005 | ||
IE | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 09.02.2005 | |
GB | 09.02.2005 | ||
DK | 09.05.2005 | ||
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | FI | 09.02.2005 | |
SE | 09.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 09.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2497413 (LABINAL [FR]) [A] 1-8 * page 5, line 1 - page 8, line 26 *; | [A]US5308258 (HATSIOS JOHN G [US]) [A] 1-8* column 3, line 7 - column 7, line 20 *; | [X]EP0749178 (HTS ELEKTROTECH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29812500U (ILME SPA [IT]) [A] 1-8 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 1 * |