EP1001508 - Electromagnetic brake with two independent front disks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alberto Sassi S.P.A Via G. Rossa, 1 40056 Crespellano (Bologna) / IT | [2007/30] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Gibierre S.r.l. Via del Commercio, 1/3 41018 S. Cesario Sul Panaro (Modena) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonfiglioli, Giancarlo Via Nenni, 24 41013 Castelfranco Emilia (Modena) / IT | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2000/20] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99121978.3 | 10.11.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | IT1998BO00635 | 16.11.1998 Original published format: IT BO980635 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1001508 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1001508 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/102, F16D65/34, F16D59/02, F16D55/24 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
H02K7/1025 (EP);
F16D55/24 (EP);
F16D59/02 (EP);
F16D2121/22 (EP);
F16D2123/00 (EP);
F16D2127/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/20] | H02K7/102, F16D65/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | Elektromagnetische Bremse mit zwei unabhängigen Scheiben | [2000/20] | English: | Electromagnetic brake with two independent front disks | [2000/20] | French: | Frein électromagnétique avec deux disques indépendants | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/43] | 04.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4509620 (VERBOS STEPHEN P [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 2 *; | [A]US5154261 (TANAKA MASAKATSU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4117095 (KLAUE HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, lines 12-57; figure 2 *; | [A]US5685398 (MARSHALL JEFFREY F [US], et al) [A] 1,3 * column A ** column 6, line 42 - column 7, line 18; figures 3,5,17,19,21 *; | [PX]DE19737485 (STROMAG AG [DE]) [PX] 1 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 16; figure 1 * |