EP1004779 - Method and device for gas supply and recuperation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2006 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [2002/06] |
Former [2000/49] | For all designated states Linde Gas AG Seitnerstrasse 70 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states Linde Technische Gase GmbH Seitnerstrasse 70 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanifl, Gottfried Triftgasse 24 7063 Oggau / AT | 02 /
Wandke, Ernst, Dr.Dipl-Ing. Lilienstrasse 39a 82538 Geretsried / DE | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2000/31] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde AG Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2000/22] | Obermüller, Bernhard Linde Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 99122145.8 | 05.11.1999 | [2000/22] | Priority number, date | DE1998154935 | 27.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19854935 | DE1999140834 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19940834 | [2000/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1004779 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1004779 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | [2003/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1004779 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F15B1/02, B22F3/15 | [2000/22] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gasversorgung und Gasrückgewinnung | [2000/22] | English: | Method and device for gas supply and recuperation | [2000/22] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'alimentation et pour la récupération de gaz | [2000/22] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 03.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 29.06.2005 | DK | 29.09.2005 | GR | 29.09.2005 | CY | 05.11.2005 | CH | 30.11.2005 | LI | 30.11.2005 | LU | 30.11.2005 | MC | 30.11.2005 | PT | 07.12.2005 | [2007/21] |
Former [2007/18] | IE | 29.06.2005 | |
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LU | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/42] | IE | 29.06.2005 | |
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | IE | 29.06.2005 | |
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.11.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | IE | 29.06.2005 | |
DK | 29.09.2005 | ||
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | IE | 29.06.2005 | |
GR | 29.09.2005 | ||
PT | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | GR | 29.09.2005 | |
PT | 07.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR797690 (INDUSTRIEGASVERWERTUNG AG F) [X] 1,5,6,10,12 * page 1, lines 37-43 * * page 2, lines 90-95 * * page 3, lines 77-102; figure 1 *; | [X]WO8801708 (AGA AB [SE]) [X] 1-3,10,11 * page 2, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 3; figure 1 *; | [AY]US4750869 (SHIPMAN III LAWRENCE A [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 29-34 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 9; figures 1-3 * [Y] 4,8,13; | [X]US5479966 (TISON RAYMOND R [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 2, lines 34-42 * * column 3, lines 3-22 * * column 5, lines 31-40; figures 1,3 *; | [AY]US5630322 (HEILMANN PAUL [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 6-42; figure 1 *[Y] 16; | [XY]US5676180 (TEEL JAMES R [US]) [X] 1,7,10,14 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 35; figure 1 * [Y] 4,8,13,15,16; | [AY]US5792271 (FUJIKAWA TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 10 * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 50; figure 1 * [Y] 15 |