EP1001221 - Gas turbine combustor cooling structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Yoshichika, Takasago Mach.Works, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Nishida, Koichi, Takasago Mach. Works, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind. Ltd., 1-1, Shinhama 2-chome, Arai-cho Takasago-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99122149.0 | 05.11.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | JP19980322378 | 12.11.1998 Original published format: JP 32237898 | JP19980323704 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: JP 32370498 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1001221 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1001221 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | [2002/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1001221 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/00, F23R3/06, F23R3/34 | [2002/28] | CPC: |
F23R3/002 (EP,US);
F23D2206/10 (EP,US);
F23D2214/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/13] | F23R3/00, F23R3/06 | ||
Former IPC [2000/20] | F23R3/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2003/14] |
Former [2000/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kühlstruktur für eine Gasturbinenbrennkammer | [2000/20] | English: | Gas turbine combustor cooling structure | [2000/20] | French: | Structure de refroidissement pour une chambre de combustion d'une turbine à gaz | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 12.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 11.08.2004 | FR | 11.08.2004 | IT | 11.08.2004 | LI | 11.08.2004 | GB | 11.11.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2006/32] | CH | 11.08.2004 | |
FR | 11.08.2004 | ||
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GB | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | CH | 11.08.2004 | |
LI | 11.08.2004 | ||
GB | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | CH | 11.08.2004 | |
LI | 11.08.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2617255 (KURT NIEHUS) [X] 1,2,13 * column 7, line 12 - line 17; figure 11 * [Y] 3,4,6,8,10,11,14-16,18,19; | [Y]US5704763 (LEE CHING-PANG [US]) [Y] 3,4,6,14-16 * column 3, line 22 - line 23; figures 1,2,5 *; | [Y]US5647202 (ALTHAUS ROLF [JP]) [Y] 8,10,18 * figures 1,5B *; | [Y]GB2087066 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 11,19 * figure 14 *; | [X]US4302940 (MEGINNIS GEORGE B) [X] 1,2,7,13,17 * figures 1,7-9 *; | [X]EP0815995 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2,6,13,16 * abstract *; | [A]JPH10227230 (TOHOKU ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al) [A] 13 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9846873 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP], et al) [A] 13 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0801210 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,2,13 * column 2, line 31 - line 33 *; | [A]US5802841 (MAEDA FUKUO [JP]) [A] 1-3,10,13,14,18 * abstract *; | [A]WO9714875 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,13 * figures 2-5 *; | [X]US2671314 (LICHTY LESTER C) [X] 20 * figure 3 *; | [X]US4073137 (ROBERTS RICHARD) [X] 20 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2548886 (ALAN HOWARD) [X] 20 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4085581 (CARUEL JACQUES EMILE JULES, et al) [A] 20 * figures 3,4 *; | [X]US4236378 (VOGT ROBERT L) [X] 21 * figures 4,5 *; | [X]GB774704 (ROLLS ROYCE) [X] 21 * page 2, line 66 - line 71; figure 1 *; | [X]US4864827 (RICHARDSON JOHN [GB], et al) [X] 21 * figure 2 * |