|
04.12.2008 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
01.09.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
20.05.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.04.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
11 |
|
28.01.2008 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
30.03.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.01.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2005 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2005 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2005 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2005 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2005 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2005 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2005 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.06.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.2005 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2005 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.12.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.08.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.02.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.12.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2002 |
Late/insufficient payment of the renewal fee without additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2001 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2001 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
07.08.2001 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.01.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.01.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2000 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2000 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.06.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2000 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.04.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1999 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1999 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.11.1999 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
09.11.1999 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1999 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1999 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
09.11.1999 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
09.11.1999 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |