EP1001127 - Door sill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niemann, Hans Dieter Am Hügel 17 50169 Kerpen-Horrem / DE | [2004/31] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states Niemann, Hans-Dieter Am Hügel 17 D-50169 Kerpen-Horrem / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahrens, Maik Jahn Strasse 12 26871 Papenburg Herbrunn / DE | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Draudt, Axel Hermann Christian, et al Dr. Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte Lönsstrasse 55 42289 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Draudt, Axel Hermann Christian, Dipl.-Ing., et al Dr. Sturies - Eichler - Füssel Patentanwälte Lönsstrasse 55 42289 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2000/20] | Eichler, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Peter Eichler, Dipl.-Ing. Michael Füssel, Brahmsstrasse 29 42289 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 99122345.4 | 10.11.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | DE1998220383U | 14.11.1998 Original published format: DE 29820383 U | [2000/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1001127 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1001127 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E06B1/70 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
E06B1/70 (EP);
E06B2001/707 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/05] |
Former [2000/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Türschwelle | [2000/20] | English: | Door sill | [2000/20] | French: | Seuil de porte | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 07.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4156325 (EDGETT EDGAR I [CA], et al) [A] 1,5,19 * column 3, line 6 - line 31 * * figures 2,4 *; | [Y]GB2087462 (LST CORP) [Y] 1,6,10,18-20 * page 1, line 123 - page 2, line 22 * * page 2, line 76 - line 86 * * figures 4,5 *; | [A]DE29505829U (NIEMANN HANS DIETER [DE]) [A] 3,4,7,10 * page 9, line 34 - page 10, line 4 ** figure 5A, *; | [A]DE29612478U (NIEMANN HANS DIETER [DE]) [A] 1,2,7 * page 4, line 30 - line 39 * * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 26 * * figure . *; | [YA]EP0851087 (WILLRICH PETER [DE]) [Y] 1,6,10,18-20 * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 27 * * figures 1,2,4 * [A] 2,8 | by applicant | DE29602408U | DE29612478U | EP0851087 |