EP1001602 - Image output processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/11] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakai, Yasuhiro 42-5, Tonotsubo Hishida Seika-cho Soraku-gun, Kyoto 619-0246 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Masakatsu 68-5, Tanaka-cho Kashihara-shi, Nara 634-0032 / JP | 03 /
Yoshiura, Syoichiro 2072-1, Ichinomoto-cho Tenri-shi, Nara 632-0004 / JP | 04 /
Maeda, Hiroshi 3-4-43, Minamiyagimachi Kashihara-shi, Nara 634-0077 / JP | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99122390.0 | 10.11.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | JP19980324010 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: JP 32401098 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1001602 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1001602 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1001602 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
H04N1/32464 (EP,US);
H04N1/3248 (EP,US);
H04N1/32486 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3288 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/02] |
Former [2000/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ausgabeverarbeitungsgerät für Bilder | [2000/20] | English: | Image output processing apparatus | [2000/20] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de sortie pour images | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 18.10.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.02.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5724490 (SHIBAKI MASAKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-21; | [YA]US4860119 (MANIWA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * column 22, line 17 - column 23, line 34 * [A] 2-21; | [A]EP0727903 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-21 * column 31, line 26 - column 33, line 4 *; | [A]US5241397 (YAMADA TATSUTOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]EP0704792 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-21 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 7 * |