EP1001225 - Device for controlling a tap equipped with safety valve belonging to a multipurpose gas cooking surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nardi Elettrodomestici S.p.A. Via Como 76, Frazione Palazzolo Milanese 20030 Paderno Dugnano (Prov. of Milan) / IT | [2000/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viezzer, Tarcisio Via Valtellina, 27 20037 Paderno Dugnano (Prov. of Milan) / IT | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2000/20] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. NOTARBARTOLO & GERVASI Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99122471.8 | 11.11.1999 | [2000/20] | Priority number, date | IT1998MI02466 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: IT MI982466 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1001225 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1001225 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F24C3/12 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
F24C3/126 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] | Extension states | SI | 06.11.2000 | Title | German: | Steuereinrichtung für Sicherheitsventil an Mehrzweckkochmulden | [2000/20] | English: | Device for controlling a tap equipped with safety valve belonging to a multipurpose gas cooking surface | [2000/20] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour vanne de sécurité d'une plaque de cuisson à fonctions multiples | [2000/20] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.02.2004 | BE | 11.02.2004 | CH | 11.02.2004 | CY | 11.02.2004 | FI | 11.02.2004 | FR | 11.02.2004 | IT | 11.02.2004 | LI | 11.02.2004 | NL | 11.02.2004 | DK | 11.05.2004 | GR | 11.05.2004 | SE | 11.05.2004 | DE | 12.05.2004 | PT | 11.07.2004 | IE | 11.11.2004 | LU | 11.11.2004 | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
CY | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
FR | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
NL | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
DE | 12.05.2004 | ||
IE | 11.11.2004 | ||
LU | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
FR | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
NL | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
DE | 12.05.2004 | ||
IE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
NL | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
DE | 12.05.2004 | ||
IE | 11.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
NL | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
DE | 12.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/12] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
DE | 12.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 11.02.2004 | |
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 11.02.2004 | |
SE | 11.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB827650 (SIMPLEX ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]FR2435003 (ATAG BV APPARATENFAB [NL]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 27 - line 40; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0412041 (ALBILUX SA [ES]) [A] 1 * abstract * |