EP1002920 - Automatic door opening system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busse, Gerald, Dr. Martin-Boyken-Ring 9 31141 Hildesheim / DE | [2000/21] | Application number, filing date | 99122479.1 | 11.11.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | DE1998153344 | 19.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19853344 | [2000/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1002920 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1002920 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1002920 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/32, E05B17/22, E05F15/20, E05F15/00, G01S13/42, G01S13/04 | [2003/27] | CPC: |
G01S15/878 (EP,US);
E05F15/40 (EP,US);
E05F15/43 (EP,US);
G01S13/48 (EP,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
G01S15/931 (EP,US);
E05C17/006 (EP,US);
E05F15/00 (EP,US);
E05F2015/433 (EP,US);
E05F2015/483 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/532 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/822 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/531 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9321 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9323 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9324 (EP,US);
G01S2013/93271 (EP,US);
G01S2013/93272 (EP,US);
G01S2013/93277 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/21] | E05C17/00, E05B17/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | Automatisches Türöffnungssystem | [2000/21] | English: | Automatic door opening system | [2000/21] | French: | Système d'ouverture automatique de porte | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 16.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.08.2009 | DK | 05.08.2009 | FI | 05.08.2009 | IE | 05.08.2009 | IT | 05.08.2009 | NL | 05.08.2009 | SE | 05.08.2009 | GR | 06.11.2009 | AT | 11.11.2009 | GB | 11.11.2009 | LU | 11.11.2009 | ES | 16.11.2009 | BE | 30.11.2009 | CH | 30.11.2009 | FR | 30.11.2009 | LI | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | PT | 05.12.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/25] | DK | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
IT | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
GR | 06.11.2009 | ||
AT | 11.11.2009 | ||
GB | 11.11.2009 | ||
LU | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
CH | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
LI | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | DK | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | DK | 05.08.2009 | |
FI | 05.08.2009 | ||
IE | 05.08.2009 | ||
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | FI | 05.08.2009 | |
NL | 05.08.2009 | ||
SE | 05.08.2009 | ||
ES | 16.11.2009 | ||
PT | 05.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5946570 ; | [A]US4458446 (MOCHIDA HARUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3-5,8,9 * the whole document *; | [YA]US4833469 (DAVID CONSTANT V [US]) [Y] 4,10 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,5,6,8,9; | [XY]WO9717520 (SENSOTECH LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,8,9 * the whole document * [Y] 4,10 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840710), vol. 008, no. 147, Database accession no. (P - 285), & JP59046570 A 19840315 (FUJI JUKOGYO KK) [A] 1,3,9 * abstract * | Examination | DE3622091 | by applicant | DE19533804 | DE19537619 |