EP1003146 - Method for identifying products by using microparticles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simons Druck + Vertrieb Gmbh Am Bagno 21 48301 Nottuln / DE | [2000/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simons, Rolf Am Bagno 21 48301 Nottuln / DE | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2003/36] |
Former [2000/21] | Schulze Horn & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Goldstrasse 50 48147 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 99122539.2 | 12.11.1999 | [2000/21] | Priority number, date | DE1998153764 | 21.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19853764 | [2000/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1003146 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1003146 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | [2001/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1003146 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/00, G06K19/06 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
G09F3/00 (EP,US);
G06K19/06009 (EP,US);
G06K2019/06234 (EP,US);
Y10S252/965 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/21] | G09F3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/39] |
Former [2000/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Sicherung und Kennzeichnung von Produkten unter Verwendung von Mikropartikeln | [2000/21] | English: | Method for identifying products by using microparticles | [2000/21] | French: | Méthode d'identification de produits par microparticules | [2000/21] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 04.08.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 02.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.08.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.08.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.01.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4390452 (STEVENS EDWARD J) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE2651528 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE19709694 (AMRHEIN HERBERT [DE], et al); | [A]DE4114795 (FOERSTER AXEL [DE]) |