EP1008719 - Method and apparatus for remote control of multilateral wells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2005 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlumberger Technology Corporation 300 Schlumberger Drive Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/27] | For all designated states Schlumberger Technology Corporation 300 Schlumberger Drive Sugar Land, TX 77478 / US | ||
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states CAMCO INTERNATIONAL INC. 7030 Ardmore Street Houston, Texas 77054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morris, Arthur John 30111 Hazy Hollow Magnolia, Texas 77355 / US | 02 /
Pringle, Ronald Earl 12030 White Cap Lane Houston, Texas 77072 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Bailey, Richard Alan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Bailey, Richard Alan, et al Marks & Clerk, 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham, GL50 1RQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/24] | Carter, Gerald A.R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1RQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99122621.8 | 23.04.1997 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | US19960638027 | 26.04.1996 Original published format: US 638027 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008719 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1008719 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E21B23/00, E21B43/30 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
E21B43/14 (EP,US);
E21B23/02 (EP,US);
E21B23/12 (EP,US);
E21B34/10 (EP,US);
E21B43/305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2000/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Fernkontrolle einer Mehrzahl von seitlichen Bohrungen | [2000/24] | English: | Method and apparatus for remote control of multilateral wells | [2000/24] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de controle a distance de puits lateraux multiples | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 02.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97919528.6 / EP0895561 | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0701045 (HALLIBURTON CO [US]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * column 6, line 9 - line 50; figure - * * column 18, line 17 - line 51 * * column 20, line 12 - column 21, line 9 * [Y] 9,10,12,15-17; | [Y]US3665955 (CONNER GEORGE EUGENE SR) [Y] 9,10,12,15-17 * column A; figure - *; | [PA]WO9707318 (PRESSURE CONTROL ENGINEERING L [GB], et al) [PA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2797893 (MCCUNE JOHN S, et al) [A] 1 * figure - * |