EP1010992 - Optical system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2007/07] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states SICK AG Sebastian-Kneipp-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alt, Gerhard Dorfstrasse 82 79350 Sexau / DE | 02 /
Ringwald, Siegfried Wellishöfe 5a 79215 Elzach / DE | 03 /
Blümcke, Thomas Elzstrasse 24 79261 Gutach / DE | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/25] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99122759.6 | 16.11.1999 | [2000/25] | Priority number, date | DE19981058769 | 18.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19858769 | [2000/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1010992 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1010992 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1010992 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/12, G02B5/00, G01V8/10, G02B17/08 | [2003/12] | CPC: |
G01V8/10 (EP);
G02B19/0028 (EP);
G02B19/0047 (EP);
G02B19/0076 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/25] | G01V8/12, G02B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/25] | Title | German: | Optisches System | [2000/25] | English: | Optical system | [2000/25] | French: | Système optique | [2000/25] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 27.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.05.2006 | FI | 31.05.2006 | GB | 31.05.2006 | IE | 31.05.2006 | NL | 31.05.2006 | DK | 31.08.2006 | SE | 31.08.2006 | GR | 01.09.2006 | ES | 11.09.2006 | PT | 31.10.2006 | AT | 16.11.2006 | LU | 16.11.2006 | BE | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
GB | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
AT | 16.11.2006 | ||
LU | 16.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
GB | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
AT | 16.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/17] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
GB | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
AT | 16.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
GB | 31.05.2006 | ||
IE | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 31.08.2006 | |
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 31.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2550814 (SICK OPTIK ELEKTRONIK ERWIN) [Y] 2,4,6 * page 6, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US4254333 (BERGSTROEM ARNE) [A] 8,9 * column 8, line 26 - column 9, line 6 ** figures 1,3,4; claim 1 *; | [A]DE3119498 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 3, paragraph 2 *; | [X]WO9610206 (HELFGOTT & KARAS P C [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,12 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 5 * * figures 2,6 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 29 * * figure 2 *; | [X]DE19601955 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,12 * column 3, line 6 - line 14 * * column 3, line 34 - line 46 * * column 5, line 4 - line 28 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]US5793538 (CAMERON BRUCE A [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,12 * column 2, line 4 - line 19 * * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 16 - line 49 * * figure 1; claims 1,2 * [Y] 2,4,6 |