EP1004855 - Length measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [2006/20] |
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tondorf, Sebastian Dr. Fischinger Weg 9 83329 Waging / DE | 02 /
Pechak, Peter Watzmannstrasse 22 83371 Stein/Traun / DE | [2000/22] | Application number, filing date | 99122917.0 | 18.11.1999 | [2000/22] | Priority number, date | DE1998154318 | 25.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19854318 | [2000/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1004855 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1004855 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1004855 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/347, G01B5/00 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
G01D5/34707 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/22] | G01D5/347 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/22] | Title | German: | Längenmesseinrichtung | [2000/22] | English: | Length measuring device | [2000/22] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de longueurs | [2000/22] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/03] | 24.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.05.2006 | FI | 17.05.2006 | FR | 17.05.2006 | IE | 17.05.2006 | IT | 17.05.2006 | DK | 17.08.2006 | SE | 17.08.2006 | GR | 18.08.2006 | ES | 28.08.2006 | PT | 17.10.2006 | AT | 18.11.2006 | LU | 18.11.2006 | BE | 30.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/36] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
AT | 18.11.2006 | ||
LU | 18.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
AT | 18.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/17] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
AT | 18.11.2006 | ||
BE | 30.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 17.08.2006 | |
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 17.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4603480 (SAKAGAMI SEIJI [JP]); | [AD]US4777728 (LUDICKE FRANK [DE]); | [A]EP0387488 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]); | [A]DE4435151 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]); | [A]US5711084 (SPANNER ERWIN [DE], et al) |