EP1006524 - Monitoring and adjusting a motor current in a disk data drive to optimize a disk rotation speed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.01.2013 [2013/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2012/08] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states THOMSON Licensing 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing, S.A. 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states THOMSON 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH Hermann-Schwer-Strasse 3 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaaden, Jürgen Im Tannhörnle 10 78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Thies, Stephan, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Thies, Stephan (DE), et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 99123075.6 | 22.11.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | EP19980403032 | 03.12.1998 Original published format: EP 98403032 | [2000/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1006524 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1006524 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B19/28 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
G11B19/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/08] |
Former [2000/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Überwachung und Einstellung des Motorstroms eines Datenplattenlaufwerks zur Optimierung der Plattenumdrehungsgeschwindigkeit | [2000/23] | English: | Monitoring and adjusting a motor current in a disk data drive to optimize a disk rotation speed | [2000/23] | French: | Contrôle et réglage du courant du moteur d'un appareil d'entrainement de disque d'emmagasinage de données pour l'optimalisation de la vitesse de rotation du disque | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 08.12.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 22.02.2012 | [2012/50] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0833328 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 41 - column 3, line 4 *; | [A]EP0821356 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,13 * abstract * * column 2, line 27 - column 5, line 58 *; | [A]WO9827549 (SIEMENS NIXDORF INF SYST [DE], et al) [A] 1,13 * abstract *; | [A]US5815478 (KIM HONG-JANG [KR]); | [A]US5612933 (ISO YOSHIMI [JP], et al); | [A] - STAN S G ET AL, "ADAPTIVE-SPEED ALGORITHMS FOR CD-ROM SYSTEMS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, (19960201), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 43 - 51, XP000583556 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.485460 |