EP1005853 - Use of betaines as antiperspirant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [2000/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wolf, Florian, Dr. Husumer Strasse 2 20251 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Keskin, Maike, Dr. Barnerstrasse 9 22765 Hamburg / DE | [2000/23] | Application number, filing date | 99123140.8 | 19.11.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | DE1998155934 | 04.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19855934 | [2000/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1005853 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1005853 | Date: | 10.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/32 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
A61Q15/00 (EP);
A61K8/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/23] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Betainen als Antitranspirantien | [2000/23] | English: | Use of betaines as antiperspirant | [2000/23] | French: | Utilisation de betaines comme agent antitranspirant | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 18.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 10.07.2002 | GR | 10.07.2002 | IE | 10.07.2002 | NL | 10.07.2002 | DK | 10.10.2002 | PT | 10.10.2002 | AT | 19.11.2002 | LU | 19.11.2002 | BE | 30.11.2002 | CY | 30.11.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/14] | FI | 10.07.2002 | |
GR | 10.07.2002 | ||
IE | 10.07.2002 | ||
NL | 10.07.2002 | ||
DK | 10.10.2002 | ||
PT | 10.10.2002 | ||
AT | 19.11.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FI | 10.07.2002 | |
GR | 10.07.2002 | ||
IE | 10.07.2002 | ||
NL | 10.07.2002 | ||
DK | 10.10.2002 | ||
PT | 10.10.2002 | ||
BE | 30.11.2002 | ||
CY | 30.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 10.07.2002 | |
GR | 10.07.2002 | ||
IE | 10.07.2002 | ||
NL | 10.07.2002 | ||
DK | 10.10.2002 | ||
PT | 10.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | FI | 10.07.2002 | |
GR | 10.07.2002 | ||
IE | 10.07.2002 | ||
NL | 10.07.2002 | ||
PT | 10.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | FI | 10.07.2002 | |
GR | 10.07.2002 | ||
NL | 10.07.2002 | ||
PT | 10.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | FI | 10.07.2002 | |
GR | 10.07.2002 | ||
NL | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 10.07.2002 | |
NL | 10.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 10.07.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1932645 (CLIN BYLA ETS) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1950643 (MANZKE OSWALD DR DIPL CHEM) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [A]FR2303536 (RHONE POULENC IND [FR]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2747355 (MICHAELS EDWIN BERNARD) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9746246 (TOMIFARM S R L [IT], et al) [AD] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1980), vol. 92, no. 6, Database accession no. 47140k, XP002133476 [A] 1-3 * Zusammenfassung * | [ ] - COSMET. TOILETRIES, (1979), vol. 94, no. 8, pages 13 - 14 |