EP1004834 - Air conditioning systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [2000/22] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujii, Toshiro KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Yokomachi, Naoya KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Okabe, Takanori KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Koide, Tatsuya KK.TOYODA Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2000/22] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/22] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99123172.1 | 23.11.1999 | [2000/22] | Priority number, date | JP19980333186 | 24.11.1998 Original published format: JP 33318698 | [2000/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1004834 | Date: | 31.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1004834 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | [2002/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F25B49/02, F25B41/04, F04B27/18, B60H1/00 | [2000/22] | CPC: |
F25B6/04 (EP,US);
B60H1/3223 (EP,US);
F04B27/1804 (EP,US);
F25B41/20 (EP,US);
F25B41/24 (EP,US);
F04B2027/185 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2002/41] |
Former [2000/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Klimaanlagen | [2000/22] | English: | Air conditioning systems | [2000/22] | French: | Systèmes de conditionnement d'air | [2000/22] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 24.07.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.11.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | 11.11.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) SE | 24.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 12.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.08.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.08.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.08.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.08.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.08.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.08.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.08.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.08.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 27.08.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.08.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.08.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.08.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.08.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.08.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.08.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH0821365 ; | [XA]US5282329 (TERANISHI TOSHIHIRO [JP]) [X] 2,3,6,9,11,13,16 * abstract * * figures 3A,3B * [A] 7,8,18; | [X]JPH06200875 ; | [PX]EP0894651 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [PX] 1,10,12 * paragraph [0088] * * figure 12 *; | [A]US5291941 (ENOMOTO MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 2,11,13 * abstract * * figure 3 *; | [A]US4723891 (TAKENAKA KENJI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0980976 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]); | [A]JPH0443873 ; | [A]JPH04321779 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 05, & JP08021365 A 19960123 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [X] 1,3-5,9,10,12,14,15,19 * abstract * * figure 4 * [A] 8 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941027), vol. 018, no. 563, Database accession no. (M - 1693), & JP06200875 A 19940719 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [X] 2,11,13 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920526), vol. 016, no. 226, Database accession no. (M - 1254), & JP04043873 A 19920213 (CALSONIC CORP) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930325), vol. 017, no. 151, Database accession no. (M - 1387), & JP04321779 A 19921111 (NIPPONDENSO CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | by applicant | DE19704914 | - LORENZ, BALES UND BROMANN, "Performance Comparison of Combitanks using a six-day test", PROCEEDINGS INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE NORTH SUN, HELSINKI, (1997), pages 119 - 128 |