EP1005890 - Silicone defoaming compositions containing polyester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.04.2008 [2008/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2000/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Innertsberger, Ernst Marie-Eberth-Strasse 15 84489 Burghausen / DE | 02 /
Siegl, Herbert Fraunhoferstrasse 3 84489 Burghausen / DE | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Fritz, Helmut, et al Wacker Chemie AG Zentralbereich Patente, Marken und Lizenzen Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | Fritz, Helmut, Dr., et al Wacker-Chemie GmbH, Zentralabteilung Patente, Marken und Lizenzen, Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99123227.3 | 25.11.1999 | [2000/23] | Priority number, date | DE1998155610 | 02.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19855610 | [2000/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1005890 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1005890 | Date: | 19.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B01D19/04, C11D3/00 | [2000/23] | CPC: |
B01D19/0404 (EP);
C11D3/0026 (EP);
C11D3/162 (EP);
C11D3/373 (EP)
| C-Set: |
B01D19/0404, B01D19/0409 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/08] |
Former [2000/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Polyester enthaltende Siliconentschäumerzusammensetzungen | [2000/23] | English: | Silicone defoaming compositions containing polyester | [2000/23] | French: | Compositions anti-mousse à base de silicone contenant du polyester | [2000/23] | Examination procedure | 25.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 25.11.1999 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 11.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2000 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 07.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.06.2002 | GB | 19.06.2002 | IT | 19.06.2002 | [2008/17] |
Former [2004/51] | FR | 19.06.2002 | |
GB | 19.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GB | 19.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4919843 (INNERTSBERGER ERNST [DE], et al) [DA] 1-5 * column 1, line 20 - line 23 * * column 1, line 50 - line 56 *; | [A]US3705859 (BOYLAN FRANCIS J) [A] 1 * column 3, line 21; claims 1,7 *; | [A]DE4404202 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 23; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9702337 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1,5 * claim 1 *; | [DA]GB1377092 (UNILEVER LTD) |