EP1043620 - Projection display system using polarized light [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | ||
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sampsell, Jeffrey B. 27119 NE Bradford Road Vancouver, WA 98682 / US | 02 /
Florence, James M. 16059 SW Waxwing Way Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99123446.9 | 24.11.1999 | [2000/41] | Priority number, date | US19990289327 | 08.04.1999 Original published format: US 289327 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1043620 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1043620 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1043620 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335, G02B27/14, G02B27/28, H04N5/74, H04N9/31 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
G02B27/123 (EP,US);
G02B27/145 (EP,US);
G02B27/149 (EP,US);
G02B27/283 (EP,US);
H04N5/7441 (EP,US);
H04N9/3105 (EP,US);
H04N9/3167 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/41] | G02F1/1335, G02B27/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/43] |
Former [2000/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Projektionsanzeigesystem, welches polarisiertes Licht verwendet | [2000/41] | English: | Projection display system using polarized light | [2000/41] | French: | Système d'affichage par projection utilisant la lumière polarisée | [2000/41] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 28.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 10.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.09.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08304739 ; | [A]US5221982 (FARIS SADEG M [US]) [A] 1-46 * the whole document *; | [A]US5381278 (SHINGAKI JUNKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-46 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0720040 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0821258 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-46 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08304739 A 19961122 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-46 * the whole document * |