EP1020875 - Emi filtering of multi-wire cables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2000/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barker, Roger Neil 2, Terrace Road Dulwich Hill, New South Wales 2203 / AU | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Wolfgang Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Schäfer, Wolfgang Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2000/29] | Schäfer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Dreiss + Partner, Gerokstr. 6 70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 99123557.3 | 26.11.1999 | [2000/29] | Priority number, date | AU1999PP08148 | 14.01.1999 Original published format: AU PP814899 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1020875 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1020875 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | [2001/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01B11/06, H05K9/00, H04Q1/10 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
H01B11/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/29] | H01B11/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/02] |
Former [2000/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | EMI - Filtrieren bei Mehrdrahtkabeln | [2000/29] | English: | Emi filtering of multi-wire cables | [2000/29] | French: | Filtration EMI de câbles multiconducteurs | [2000/29] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 01.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/50] | 12.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5209964 (NAKAGAWA ASAHARU [JP]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0584658 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE]) [A] 1,8,11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0597324 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1,8,11 * the whole document *; | [PX]DE19909569 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [PX] 1-12* the whole document * |