EP1008679 - Jacquard heddle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Michel Van de Wiele Michel Vandewielestraat 7/17 B-8510 Kortrijk (Marke) / BE | [2010/02] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states N.V. Michel Van de Wiele Michel Vandewielestraat 7/17 B-8510 Kortrijk (Marke) / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Debaes, Johhny Diepestraat 5 8890 Moorslede / BE | 02 /
Vanderjeugt, Bram Pannehuisstraat 45 8900 Ieper / BE | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Leherte, Georges M.L.M. K.O.B. N.V. Pres. Kennedypark 31c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Leherte, Georges M.L.M., Dr. K.O.B. n.v., Pres. Kennedypark 31c 8500 Kortrijk / BE | Application number, filing date | 99123653.0 | 29.11.1999 | [2000/24] | Priority number, date | BE19980000875 | 04.12.1998 Original published format: BE 9800875 | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1008679 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1008679 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | [2001/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1008679 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D03C3/40 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
D03C3/40 (EP,US);
Y10T24/3918 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/19] |
Former [2000/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Jacquardlitze | [2000/24] | English: | Jacquard heddle | [2000/24] | French: | Lisse Jacquard | [2000/24] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2759095 (TARDY JEAN JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1,7-10 * page 3, line 20 - line 27 *; | [X]DE2316446 (KENK THEO) [X] 1,7-10 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 11; figure - *; | [A]DE1074515 (PRIESNER); | [A]GB1424260 (EGELHAAF C C); | [A]FR2165827 (STAEUBLI AG) | by applicant | FR2759095 | DE2316446 |