EP1104894 - Wrist watch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2002 [2002/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Grenchen / CH | [2001/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paratte, Daniel Rue de L'Evole 56 2003 Neuchatel / CH | [2001/23] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/23] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 99123830.4 | 01.12.1999 | [2001/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1104894 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/14, A44C5/14 | [2001/23] | CPC: |
A44C5/14 (EP);
G04B37/1486 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2002/09] |
Former [2001/23] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Armbanduhr | [2001/23] | English: | Wrist watch | [2001/23] | French: | Montre-bracelet | [2001/23] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/41] | 16.04.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.01.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.01.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.01.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4825427 (WOLLMAN JACK) [X] 1 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-6 * [Y] 2; | [XY]US4831606 (AELLEN PIERRE-ANDRE) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 2; | [X]US5206841 (BOUCHERON ALAIN) [X] 1 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 61; figure 1 *; | [YD]CH632634 (MONTRES RADO S.A.) [YD] 2 * page 4, column L, lines 7-17 *; | [Y]CH650895 (RUEDIN GEORGES) [Y] 2 * abstract * |