EP0984235 - Control method for a refrigerator having high efficiency multi-evaporator cycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/10] | Refrigerator having high efficiency multi-evaporator cycle (h.m.cycle) and control method thereof | ||
[2002/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoo, Han Joo No. 3-212 Jeil Apt., Chulsan-1-dong Kwangmyong-city, Kyungki-do 423-031 / KR | 02 /
Suh, Sang Wook, Sang Wook Suh Int. Patent Law Firm 823-23, Yeoksam-dong, Kangnam-ku Seoul 135-080 / KR | 03 /
Lee, Jae Seung, No. 102-106, Tongshin Apt. Jeungja-dong, Changan-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do 440-300 / KR | 04 /
Suh, Kook Jung 75-1, Hoeki-dong, Tongdaemoon-gu Seoul 130-050 / KR | 05 /
Lee, Hae Min No. 30-704, Kaenari Apt., Yeoksam-dong, Kangnam-ku Seoul 135-080 / KR | 06 /
Lim, Jae Hoon No. 51-505, Kwonsun Apt. 3rd Suwon-city, Kyungki-do 441-390 / KR | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Sherrard-Smith, Hugh, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Sherrard-Smith, Hugh, et al Appleyard Lees, 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY, West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 99123902.1 | 11.11.1995 | [2000/10] | Priority number, date | KR19290047894 | 11.11.1994 Original published format: KR 2947894 | KR19300032294 | 17.11.1994 Original published format: KR 3032294 | KR19300032394 | 17.11.1994 Original published format: KR 3032394 | KR19300080294 | 22.11.1994 Original published format: KR 3080294 | KR19300078294 | 22.11.1994 Original published format: KR 3078294 | KR19120039595 | 18.05.1995 Original published format: KR 1239595 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0984235 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0984235 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0984235 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F25D11/02, F25D17/06, F25D29/00 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
F25B5/04 (EP,US);
F25D11/022 (EP,US);
F25D17/062 (EP,US);
F25D17/065 (EP,US);
F25D29/00 (EP,US);
F25B2600/0251 (EP,US);
F25B2600/23 (EP,US);
F25D21/06 (EP,US);
F25D2317/061 (EP,US);
F25D2317/0653 (EP,US);
F25D2317/0682 (EP,US);
F25D2400/04 (EP,US);
F25D2400/28 (EP,US);
F25D2400/30 (EP,US);
F25D2700/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/10] | Title | German: | Steuerungsverfahren für einen Kühlschrank mit Hochleistungsmehrverdampferkreislauf | [2002/06] | English: | Control method for a refrigerator having high efficiency multi-evaporator cycle | [2002/06] | French: | Procédé de commande d'un réfrigérateur avec un cycle à plusieurs évaporateurs et à haute efficacité | [2002/06] |
Former [2000/10] | Kühlschrank mit Hochleistungsmehrverdampferkreislauf und Steuerungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2000/10] | Refrigerator having high efficiency multi-evaporator cycle (h.m.cycle) and control method thereof | ||
Former [2000/10] | Réfrigérateur avec un cycle à plusieurs évaporateurs et à haute efficacité et procédé de commande associé | Examination procedure | 17.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 12.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95936118.9 / EP0791162 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0602379 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 3; figure 2 *; | [AD]US5150583 (JASTER HEINZ [US], et al) [AD] 1 * column 4, line 33 - column 8, line 11; figure 1 *; | [A]US4416119 (WILSON RAYMOND G [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 28 - column 7, line 6; figure 2 *; | [A]DE4210603 (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]) [A] 7 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 62; figure 1 * |