EP1016354 - Process to produce molded parts from polymeric foam particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/13] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Frauenhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 D-80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ziegler, Maik Sperberweg 13 71287 Weissach / DE | 02 /
Geissler, Adam, Dr. Lachenweg 10 76689 Karlsdorf-Neuthard / DE | 03 /
Kauffmann, Axel Frankenweg 10 71263 Weil der Stadt / DE | 04 /
Ziegler, Lars Hauffstrasse 26 71229 Leonberg / DE | 05 /
Hofmann, Knut Händelstrasse 8 75015 Bretten / DE | 06 /
Elsner, Peter, Dr. Amselstrasse 8 76327 Pfinztal / DE | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2001/46] |
Former [2000/27] | Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti Dipl.-Phys. Dr.rer.nat. Jost Lempert Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 99124108.4 | 02.12.1999 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | DE19981060611 | 29.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19860611 | [2000/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016354 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016354 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A43B7/28, A42B3/00, B29B13/06 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
B29C67/205 (EP,US);
B29C44/58 (KR);
B29C44/3415 (EP,US);
B29C44/445 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0855 (EP,US);
B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Formkörpern aus Polymer-Schaumpartikeln | [2000/27] | English: | Process to produce molded parts from polymeric foam particles | [2000/27] | French: | Procédé pour produire des objets moulés à partir de particules de mousse en polymère | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 21.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 27.03.2002 | GB | 27.03.2002 | GR | 27.03.2002 | IE | 27.03.2002 | NL | 27.03.2002 | DK | 27.06.2002 | PT | 27.06.2002 | SE | 27.06.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | AT | 02.12.2002 | LU | 02.12.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/31] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
AT | 02.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GB | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.06.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3437786 (LUTZ NORBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 1,6,8,9 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0672708 (SCHOELLHORN WOLF DIETRICH [DE]) [A] 1-23* claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9602375 (SIDAS SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1,6,8,9 * page 5, lines 4-8; figure 1; claim 1 * |